EP3345371 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman / KY | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Dong c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Panfeng c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xin c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Tingliang c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16842848.0 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016US49562 | Priority number, date | CN201510551943 | 01.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510551943 | US201615251336 | 30.08.2016 Original published format: US201615251336 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017040570 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345371 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, H04L29/06, G06F21/62 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (CN);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/104 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2141 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2018/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATION | [2018/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 28.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012233668 (LEAFE EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,9,12,13 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0129] *; | [Y]US2014282889 (ISHAYA VISHVANANDA [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,9,12,13* paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100] *; | [XY]US8856954 (HATHAWAY MATTHEW R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,11,14,15 * column 2 - column 6 * * column 8 * [Y] 3-5,9,12,13 | International search | [X]US8856954 (HATHAWAY MATTHEW R [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * , entire document especially col 3, lines 2-48, col 5, lines 13-15, col 6, lines 33-49 *; | [A]US2007214364 (ROBERTS NICOLE A [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009249477 (PUNERA KUNAL [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2003154406 (HONARVAR LAURENCE TORAJ [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2011191838 (YANAGIHARA KAZU [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * | by applicant | US8856954 | US2012233668 | US2014282889 | WO2015013745 |