EP3344751 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING PRFA MEDIATED VIRULENCE GENE ACTIVATION INLISTERIA SPP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTNOY, Daniel A. 1208 Ordway Street Albany, California 94706 / US | 02 /
PORTMAN, Jonathan L. 1945 Berkeley Way Apt. 206 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16843025.4 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016US50004 | Priority number, date | US201562213579P | 02.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562213579 P | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017040859 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344751 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12N15/52, A61K35/74, C12N1/32, A61P31/04 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (US);
A61K35/74 (EP,US);
A61K39/0208 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
H02J7/007 (US);
H02M1/0009 (US);
H02M1/083 (US);
H02M3/155 (US);
A61K2039/521 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12N15/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MODULATION DER AKTIVIERUNG EINES PRFA-VERMITTELTEN VIRULENZGENS IN LISTERIA SPP | [2018/28] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING PRFA MEDIATED VIRULENCE GENE ACTIVATION INLISTERIA SPP | [2018/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR MODULATION DE L'ACTIVATION À MÉDIATION PAR PRFA DU GÈNE DE VIRULENCE DANSLISTERIA SPP | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 01.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/21] | 26.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006121053 (SWEENEY PAMELA [US], et al); | [XI]US2014127816 (HANSON WILLIAM G [US], et al); | International search | [A]US7935804 (DUBENSKY JR THOMAS W [US], et al); | [Y]US2015125480 (PATERSON YVONNE [US], et al); |