Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10875289 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | B2 | US2019084289 | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562217317 | 11.09.2015 | WO2016CA51067 | 09.09.2016 | US201615758972 | 11.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2998261 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2022 | C | CA2998261 | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562217317 | 11.09.2015 | WO2016CA51067 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3347192 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2022 | B1 | EP3347192 | 03.07.2019 | A4 | EP3347192 | 18.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562217317 | 11.09.2015 | WO2016CA51067 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017041179 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562217317 | 11.09.2015 |