EP3347192 - 3D PRINTER AND RELATED SET OF PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/29] | 3D PRINTER, RELATED SET OF PARTS AND METHODS | ||
[2022/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Issa, Joseph 10550 Place de L'Acadie Suite 1005 Montreal, Québec H4N 0B3 / CA | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 16843334.0 | 09.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016CA51067 | Priority number, date | US201562217317P | 11.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562217317 P | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017041179 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347192 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3347192 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/227, B29C64/118, B29C64/20, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/00, G05B19/4099 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B29C64/20 (EP,US);
B29C64/118 (EP,US);
B29C64/227 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | B29C64/227, B29C64/118, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/00, G05B19/4099, G06F17/50 | ||
Former IPC [2018/29] | B29C67/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/00, G05B19/4099, G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3D-DRUCKER UND ZUGEHÖRIGER TEILESATZ | [2022/06] | English: | 3D PRINTER AND RELATED SET OF PARTS | [2022/06] | French: | IMPRIMANTE 3D ET SON JEU DE PIÈCES | [2022/06] |
Former [2018/29] | 3D-DRUCKER, ZUGEHÖRIGER TEILESATZ UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2018/29] | 3D PRINTER, RELATED SET OF PARTS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2018/29] | IMPRIMANTE 3D, SON JEU DE PIÈCES ET SES PROCÉDÉS | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 10.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 03.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2016 | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | CY | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | ES | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | MK | 20.07.2022 | MT | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | PL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SE | 20.07.2022 | SI | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | IE | 09.09.2022 | LU | 09.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 09.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
IE | 09.09.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
LU | 09.09.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
ES | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
PL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "iRapid - A new 3D printer built with "rack and pinion" concept", (20120419), URL: https://www.3ders.org/articles/20120419-irapid-a-new-3d-printer-built-with-rack-and-pinion-concept.html, (20190423), XP002790829 [A] 1-15 * See the videos in particular * | [A] - Komb, "Wallace G1 3D Printer", (20150305), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://www.thingiverse.com/thing:710552, (20181022), XP055517671 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Andrews, "Afinia H480 3D Printer, User Manual", (20140331), URL: https://fccid.io/O26-H480/User-Manual/User-Manual-2228946.pdf, (20190521), XP002791523 [A] 1-15 | International search | [EY]WO2016147111 (LORUSSO ALESSIO [IT]) [EY] 39-41* whole document *; | [AY] - "Squire, Lance. Wallace G1 3D Printer", (20150305), URL: http://www.thingiverse.com/thing:710552, (20161122) [A] 24-33 * whole document * [Y] 1, 2, 6-12, 17-20, 22, 39, and 41 | [XP] - BUREN, ALEC., "Study 3D printing from the inside out with 3D printed educational ULIO 3D printer", (20160805), URL: http://www.3ders.org/articles/20160805-study-3d-printing-from-the-inside-out-with-3d-printed-educational-ulio-3d-printer.html, (20161110), XP055366944 [XP] 24-33 * whole document * | [XY] - "Afinia3D H480 Setup Overview.", Afinia 3D, (20140310), URL: https://www.youtube.becom/watch?v=ZFtE1AJfRMk, (20161110) [X] 34-38 and 42 [Y] 1, 2, 6-12, 17-20, 22, 39, and 41 |