EP3348443 - ELECTRIC BRAKE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Akiyoshi c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Tatsuya c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 29bis, rue d' Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2018/29] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16844287.9 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016JP75880 | Priority number, date | JP20150177242 | 09.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015177242 | JP20150180302 | 14.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015180302 | [2018/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017043426 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348443 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3348443 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, B60T13/74 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
B60T13/741 (EP,US);
B60T8/172 (US);
B60T13/74 (US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (US);
B60T8/171 (US);
B60T8/32 (US);
F16D55/226 (EP);
F16D65/183 (EP);
B60T2201/12 (EP,US);
B60T2220/04 (EP,US);
F16D2121/24 (EP);
F16D2125/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE BREMSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/29] | English: | ELECTRIC BRAKE DEVICE | [2018/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREIN ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2018 | Translation filed | 04.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 04.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2016 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | IT | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | MT | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE19736997 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 24 - line 32 * * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, line 56 - line 65 * * figure 1 * [A] 4-7 [Y] 3; | [A]EP1186495 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [XY]US2003062228 (ICHINOSE MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0026] , [0051] - [0054] - [0057] * * figures 1,4,7,8 * [Y] 3; | [YA]EP1894804 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0148] * [A] 4; | [Y]WO2015033863 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0038] * * page 34; figures 3,4 *; | [P]EP3042814 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0038] * | International search | [A]JP2009012655 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7* , paragraphs [0002], [0028] to [0032]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010083282 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0019], [0030] to [0031]; fig. 1 to 3, 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012236492 (ADVICS CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0042] to [0049]; fig. 3 to 6 (Family: none) * |