EP3347907 - IGNITION COIL FOR PASSING ALTERNATING CURRENT TO A SPARK PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marshall Electric Corp. 425 State Road 25 North P.O. Box 909 Rochester, IN 46975 / US | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARRS, Thomas, C. 425 State Road 25 North P.O. Box 909 Rochester, IN 46975 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16845004.7 | 08.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US50646 | Priority number, date | US201514851267 | 11.09.2015 Original published format: US201514851267 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044544 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347907 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/12, F02P1/08, F02P3/01, H01F5/02, F02P15/10, // F02P13/00, F02P3/08 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
F02P3/01 (EP,US);
H01T15/00 (US);
F02P15/10 (EP,US);
F02P3/02 (US);
H01F38/12 (EP,US);
H01F5/02 (EP,US);
F02P1/086 (EP,US);
F02P13/00 (EP,US);
F02P3/0807 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | H01F38/12, F02P1/08, F02P3/01, H01F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | ZÜNDSPULE ZUM LEITEN VON WECHSELSTROM ZU EINER ZÜNDKERZE | [2018/29] | English: | IGNITION COIL FOR PASSING ALTERNATING CURRENT TO A SPARK PLUG | [2018/29] | French: | BOBINE D'ALLUMAGE DESTINÉE À APPLIQUER UN COURANT ALTERNATIF À UNE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 26.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 16.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6112730 (MARRS THOMAS C [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]US6545415 (WARD MICHAEL A V [US]) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1,7,5a,8a *; | [Y]US2009188458 (VISSER BAREND [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-14* paragraphs [0014] , [0 18]; figure - *; | [XI]DE102010062305 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,12,14 * figures 5,6 * [I] 3-8,10,11,13 | International search | [A]US5947093 (WARD MICHAEL A V [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US6328025 (MARRS THOMAS C [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US6545415 (WARD MICHAEL A V [US]) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2003084889 (SKINNER ALBERT ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 7, 18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2009188458 (VISSER BAREND [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011074532 (CHENG WO OI [HK], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document * | by applicant | US3048704 | US3542006 | US4875457 | US5181498 | US5359981 | US5615659 | US5806504 | US6112730 |