EP3352121 - CONTENT DELIVERY METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd Room 403 East Block 2 SEG Park Zhenxing Road Futian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Zheng Room 403 East Block 2 SEG Park Zhenxing Road, Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16845529.3 | 18.05.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016CN82502 | Priority number, date | CN201510593480 | 17.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510593480 | [2018/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017045415 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352121 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q30/02 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G06Q10/047 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (CN);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F17/18 (US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0278 (EP,US);
H04L43/06 (US);
H04L51/52 (CN);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | INHALTSBEREITSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2018/30] | English: | CONTENT DELIVERY METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2018 | Translation filed | 10.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 10.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 29.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008162260 (ROHAN TERRENCE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010088130 (BONCHI FRANCESCO [ES], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2012278476 (AGRAWAL DAKSHI [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2013318180 (AMIN MOHAMMAD SHAFKAT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2015019588 (YANG CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101520878 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * , claim 1, and description, page 4, paragraph 5 to page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO2009154430 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2010100415 (PLUMMER MATT [US], et al) [A] 1-19* , the whole document *; | [A]CN102110265 (TENCENT INC) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103294800 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN104902294 (KUYUN INTERACTIVE TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN105262794 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [PX] 1-19 * , claims 1-18, and description, paragraphs [0128]-[0130] * |