EP3351511 - DEVICE FOR TREATING WATER FOR HOUSEHOLD USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hierro, Alain Urb. Los Balcones C/Germanias 35 03186 Torrevieja (Alicante) / ES | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Ibarra Garcia, Isabel PADIMA Explanada de España 11,1° 03002 Alicante / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Sempere Massa, Iván Luis Explanada de España nº 11, 1º 03002 Alicante / ES | ||
Former [2018/30] | Sempere Massa, Iván Luis C/Gerona, 15-17, 1º 03001 Alicante / ES | Application number, filing date | 16845774.5 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016ES70621 | Priority number, date | ES20150031322 | 17.09.2015 Original published format: ES 201531322 | [2018/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017046431 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3351511 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3351511 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, B01D24/22 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
C02F1/003 (EP,US);
B01D24/22 (EP,ES,RU,US);
C01F1/00 (RU);
B01D2101/02 (US);
B01D2201/4092 (US);
C02F1/281 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
C02F1/467 (US);
C02F1/505 (EP,US);
C02F2201/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 16.04.2018 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON BRAUCHWASSER | [2018/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING WATER FOR HOUSEHOLD USE | [2018/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU À USAGE DOMESTIQUE | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2018 | Translation filed | 16.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 16.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3204770 (BRINK ROBERT V); | [I]DE202007000153U (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO2012031853 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) | International search | [A]DE2164965 (DIETZ ARMATUREN E); | [A]US4536290 (BONAZZO ROBERT [US]); | [A]US5322625 (RISE GERALD [US]); | [A]US5656160 (PARISE MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [A]EP1106225 (BRITA GMBH [DE]) |