EP3352089 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IINE Card Japan Inc. 14F, Hibiya Central Bldg. 1-2-9 Nishi-Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLUSARCZYK, Jakub c/o iine Card Japan Inc. 14F, Hibiya Central Bldg. 1-2-9 Nishi-Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | 02 /
WOSZIDLO, Rouven c/o iine Card Japan Inc. 14F, Hibiya Central Bldg. 1-2-9 Nishi-Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | 03 /
SMILOWICZ, Tomasz c/o iine Card Japan Inc. 14F, Hibiya Central Bldg. 1-2-9 Nishi-Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16845955.0 | 14.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016JP04198 | Priority number, date | JP20150180977 | 14.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015180977 | [2018/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017047081 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352089 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06, G06F13/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (EP,US);
G06F16/583 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0639 (EP,US);
G06T1/0007 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | G06F13/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/30] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2018/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2018 | Translation filed | 14.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 14.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]JP2013235478 (NET MOVE CORP) [X] 1, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0045], [0057] to [0059], [0071] to [0072]; fig. 1 to 5, 13 to 14 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-5, 9-12; | [Y]JP5746452B (Rakuten, Inc.) [Y] 2, 9-12 * , paragraphs [0054] to [0059], [0069], [0128], [0140], [0150]; fig. 2 & WO 2016/084258 A1 *; | [Y]JP2001216401 (OYAMA MITSURU) [Y] 3-5 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0031], [0035] to [0045]; fig. 2 to 4, 6 to 10 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014157420 (TAB INC) [A] 3-5 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0034], [0039] to [0046], [0055] to [0064]; fig. 4 to 5, 8 to 9 & WO 2014/126197 A1 * |