EP3351792 - SPRING-DRIVEN DEVICE AND SELF-TRAVELING CASTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endo Kogyo Co., Ltd. 14-7 Akiba-cho 3-chome Tsubame-shi, Niigata 959-1261 / JP | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMABA, Tomio c/o ENDO KOGYO CO. LTD. 14-7 Akiba-cho 3-chome Tsubame-shi Niigata 959-1261 / JP | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Poskett, Oliver James Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16846241.4 | 30.08.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016JP75268 | Priority number, date | JP20150184990 | 18.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015184990 | JP20160071354 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016071354 | [2018/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017047370 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3351792 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03G1/02, F03G1/08 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
F03G1/02 (EP,US);
F03G1/022 (KR);
B60B33/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60B33/0039 (US);
B60B33/0049 (US);
B60B33/045 (US);
B62B5/0026 (KR,US);
F03G1/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16D41/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60B2200/43 (KR,US);
B60B2380/16 (KR,US);
B60B33/0063 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | F03G1/02, B60B33/00, F03G1/08, F16D41/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | FEDERANGETRIEBENE VORRICHTUNG UND SELBSTFAHRENDE ROLLE | [2018/30] | English: | SPRING-DRIVEN DEVICE AND SELF-TRAVELING CASTER | [2018/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF À ENTRAÎNEMENT PAR RESSORT ET ROULETTE À DÉPLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2018 | Translation filed | 16.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 16.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US359068 ; | [XI]US1255431 (KOCOUREK HENRY [US]); | [XI]US1831070 (HOWELL ALBERT S); | [XDI]JPH09182878 (SEIKOUKEN KK) | International search | [A]US4241534 (CORRIS DEREK A [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * , fig. 2, 4 & DE 2950427 A1 & FR 2448921 A1 & ES 487091 A1 *; | [A]JPS5653164Y (Yanmar Agricultural Equipment Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-27 * , column 3, line 38 to column 4, line 33; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6384590 (TAKARA CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * , fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005351188 (KOMATSU ZENOA KK) [A] 1-27 * , paragraph [0036]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009293485 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * , paragraph [0022]; fig. 3 & US 2009/0301425 A1 paragraph [0039]; fig. 3 & EP 2131035 A1 & CN 101598099 A & ES 2431351 T3 *; | [A]JP4710134B (Kazumasa OKAMURA) [A] 1-27 * , column 2, line 30 to column 4, line 3; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011236879 (SAEKI RYOJI) [A] 1-27 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0009]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014156292 (ENDO KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-27* , paragraph [0034]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) * |