EP3351119 - VACUUM TYPE ROASTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kang, Kyoung Hoon 104-702 30 Sinseong-ro Dong-gu Daegu 41204 / KR | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16846873.4 | 13.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016KR10337 | Priority number, date | KR20150132294 | 18.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150132294 | KR20160116642 | 09.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160116642 | [2018/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048052 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3351119 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3351119 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23N12/10, A23N12/12, F04B37/16, F04B37/08, H05B3/00, G01L21/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
A23F5/04 (EP);
A23N12/10 (EP,KR,US);
A23N12/08 (EP);
A23N12/12 (EP,KR);
A23N12/125 (EP);
F04B37/08 (EP,KR);
F04B37/16 (EP,KR);
F26B11/049 (US);
G01L21/00 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUMRÖSTER | [2018/30] | English: | VACUUM TYPE ROASTER | [2018/30] | French: | MACHINE À GRILLER DE TYPE À VIDE | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2017 | Translation filed | 12.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 12.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2016 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | IE | 13.09.2020 | LU | 13.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | GB | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 13.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GB | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GB | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GB | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.09.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2593983 (EMIL CHALUPA) [Y] 5,6 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 1 - line 40 * * column 3, line 1 - line 67 ** column 5, line 22 - line 41 *; | [XYI]KR100804835B (AHN SANG KYUNG [KR]) [X] 1,8 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * [Y] 2-6 [I] 7; | [Y]KR20090030655 (LEE SANG HYOUK [KR]) [Y] 2-4 * figures 3,4; claims 1,3 * | International search | [Y]KR0127338Y (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 5-6 * See claim 1 and figure 2. *; | [XY]KR100804835B (AHN SANG KYUNG [KR]) [X] 1, 7-8 * See paragraph [0043]; claim 1 and figures 2-3. * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]KR20090030655 (LEE SANG HYOUK [KR]) [Y] 2-4 * See claims 1, 3 and figures 1, 4. *; | [A]KR20090071868 (AHN SANG KYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-8* See claim 1 and figure 2. *; | [A]KR101228614B (TAEHWAN AUTOMATION IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * See claims 1, 6 and figures 1-2. * |