EP3353590 - TEAR-OFF LENS CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RO Technologies, LLC 7200 Montessouri Str., Suite 100 Las Vegas, NV 89113 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Racing Optics, Inc. 7200 Montessouri Street Suite 100 Las Vegas, Nevada 89113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Bart E. 7200 Montessouri St. Ste. 100 Las Vegas, Nevada 89113 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Stephen S. 7200 Montessouri St. Ste. 100 Las Vegas, Nevada 89113 / US | 03 /
KLEIN, Maxwell C. 100 Park Vista Drive Unit 3008 Las Vegas, Nevada 89138 / US | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16847200.9 | 14.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016US51662 | Priority number, date | US201562219390P | 16.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562219390 P | US201615175623 | 07.06.2016 Original published format: US201615175623 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048797 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3353590 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/02, A42B3/26 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A61F9/025 (EP,US);
A61F9/029 (EP,US);
A42B3/26 (EP,US);
A61F9/027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG EINER ABREISSBAREN LINSE | [2018/31] | English: | TEAR-OFF LENS CAPTURE | [2018/31] | French: | CAPTURE DE LENTILLE DÉTACHABLE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 13.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4138746 (BERGMANN DONALD W) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 63 - column 5, line 42; figures 2-7,10-11 *; | [A]US4716601 (MCNEAL JOSEPH R [US]) [A] 1-15* column 5, line 1 - page 6, line 34; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5685022 (ESSMAN DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 13 - line 36; figures 3,5 * | International search | [Y]US4716601 (MCNEAL JOSEPH R [US]) [Y] 1-19 * See column 4, line 67 - column 6, line 49; claims 1, 12; and figures 1-7. *; | [A]US7200875 (DONDERO JOHN [US]) [A] 1-19 * See figures 1-2, 9. *; | [A]US8261375 (REAUX BRIAN K [US]) [A] 1-19* See figures 1, 5-7. *; | [A]WO2014093514 (OAKLEY INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * See figures 29-30, 31A-31E. *; | [Y]US2014247489 (WILSON BART [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * See paragraph [0021]; and figures 2-4. * | by applicant | US5685022 |