EP3349580 - HEPATITIS B CORE PROTEIN MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assembly Biosciences, Inc. 11711 North Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, William 3688 E. Tamaron Drive Bloomington, IN 47408 / US | 02 /
ARNOLD, Lee, Daniel 3751 East Sterling Avenue Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | 03 /
MAAG, Hans Schwand 7 79692 Kleines Wiesental / DE | 04 /
LI, Leping 11711 N. Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 05 /
BURES, Mark 11711 N. Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 06 /
HAYDAR, Simon 11711 N. Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 07 /
FRANCIS, Samson 351 West 10th Street Indianapolis, IN 46204 / US | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/30] | 01 /
TURNER, William 3688 E. Tamaron Drive Bloomington, IN 47408 / US | ||
02 /
ARNOLD, Lee, Daniel 3751 East Sterling Avenue Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | |||
03 /
MAAG, Hans Schwand 7 79692 Kleires Wiesental / DE | |||
04 /
LI, Leping 11711 N. Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
05 /
BURES, Mark 11711 N. Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
06 /
HAYDAR, Simon 11711 N. Meridian Street Suite 310 Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
07 /
FRANCIS, Samson 351 West 10th Street Indianapolis, IN 46204 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16847295.9 | 15.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016US51934 | Priority number, date | US201562218815P | 15.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562218815 P | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048950 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349580 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3349580 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C07D243/38, C07D453/02, C07D471/04, C07D267/20, C07D281/16, A61K31/551, A61K31/553, A61K31/554, A61P31/20 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D281/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/553 (KR);
A61K31/554 (KR,US);
A61P31/00 (KR);
A61P31/20 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/22 (KR);
C07D243/38 (EP,US);
C07D267/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | A01N57/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEPATITIS-B-KERN-PROTEINMODULATOREN | [2018/30] | English: | HEPATITIS B CORE PROTEIN MODULATORS | [2018/30] | French: | MODULATEURS DES PROTÉINES DU NOYAU DE L'HÉPATITE B | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20185808.1 / EP3782626 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/45] |
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007105835 (KAZANTSEV ALEKSEY G [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim -; table 1 *; | [A]WO2013006394 (INST HEPATITIS & VIRUS RES [US], et al) [A] 1-3* claim -; table 9 *; | [XP]WO2015138895 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-3 * pages 265-268, compounds 1620-1624, 1627;; claim - * | International search | [XY]WO2015017412 (US HEALTH [US]) [X] 1-3, 8, 21-23 * , entire document, especially: Claim 18, pg 103, third compound listed, 10-Ethyl-N-(5-methylthiazol-2-yl)-11-oxo-10,11-dihydrodibenzo[b,f][1,4]thiazepine-8- carboxamide 5-oxide; Claim 18, pg 103, first compound listed, 10-Ethyl-N-((2-methylthiazol-4-yl)methyl)-11-oxo-10,11-dihydrodibenzo [b,f] [1,4] * [Y] 9; | [Y] - PubChem, (20050809), Database accession no. 201327, XP055371494 [Y] 9 * , formula * | [A] - XIAO et al., "Discovery, Optimization, and Characterization of Novel D2 Dopamine Receptor Selective Antagonists", J Med Chem., (20140000), vol. 57, pages 3450 - 3463, XP055140768 [A] 1-3, 8-9, 21-23 * , entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm500126s |