EP3349688 - BIOREACTOR AND RESEEDING CHAMBER SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Virginia Patent Foundation 722 Preston Avenue, Suite 107 Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | For all designated states Cao, Yiqi 1704 Garden Spring Dr. Blacksburg, Virginia 24060 / US | For all designated states Luu, Lydia 8614 Grosvenor Ct. Fairfax, Virginia 22031 / US | For all designated states Zhang, Wade 415 Lane Rd. Charlottesville, Virginia 22903 / US | For all designated states Christ, George 415 Lane Rd. Charlottesville, Virginia 22903 / US | For all designated states Smith, Kimberly C. 125 Wood Duck Place 102 Charlottesville, Virginia 22902 / US | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Yiqi 1704 Garden Spring Dr. Blacksburg, Virginia 24060 / US | 02 /
LUU, Lydia 8614 Grosvenor Ct. Fairfax, Virginia 22031 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Wade 415 Lane Rd. Charlottesville, Virginia 22903 / US | 04 /
CHRIST, George 415 Lane Rd. Charlottesville, Virginia 22903 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Kimberly C. 125 Wood Duck Place 102 Charlottesville, Virginia 22902 / US | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16847304.9 | 15.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016US51948 | Priority number, date | US201562218712P | 15.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562218712 P | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048961 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349688 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, C12M1/00, C12M3/00, C12N5/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
C12M21/08 (EP,US);
C12M25/14 (EP,US);
C12M35/00 (US);
C12M35/04 (EP,US);
C12N2513/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | BIOREAKTOR UND NACHSAATKAMMERSYSTEM SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN DAVON | [2018/30] | English: | BIOREACTOR AND RESEEDING CHAMBER SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS THEREOF | [2018/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BIORÉACTEUR ET DE CHAMBRE DE RÉENSEMENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 16.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012021814 (UNIV WAKE FOREST HEALTH SCIENCES [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph l - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph 2 - page 19, paragraph 2; example 2 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP1734110 (INST NAGOYA IND SCIENCE RES [JP]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, paragraph [0001] * * column 2, paragraph [0008] * * column 5, paragraphs [0016]-[0018]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2010323438 (PORTER BLAISE D [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph [0004] * * page 2, paragraphs [0032]-[0034] * * page 3, paragraphs [0038]-[0040]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]CN102433258 ; | [A]CN102433258 (UNIV BEIHANG) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - MASOOD A. MACHINGAL ET AL, "A Tissue-Engineered Muscle Repair Construct for Functional Restoration of an Irrecoverable Muscle Injury in a Murine Model", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A, (20110901), vol. 17, no. 17-18, doi:10.1089/ten.tea.2010.0682, ISSN 1937-3341, pages 2291 - 2303, XP055104195 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2292, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 2; figure 1F * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.tea.2010.0682 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 40, Database accession no. 2012-F57147, XP002790660 & CN102433258 A 20120502 (UNIV BEIJING AERONAUTICS & ASTRONAUTICS) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2012100602 (LU HELEN H [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2011172683 (YOO JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2006239981 (YOO JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2006141623 (SMITH TIMOTHY J N [CA], et al) [A] 31 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2011212500 (BORONYAK STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2004219659 (ALTMAN GREGORY H [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * ; entire document * | by applicant | - CORONA et al., Tissue Eng. Part A, (20130000), vol. 20, pages 705 - 715 | - WUNDERLI et al., Biomechanics, (20140000), URL: http://www.biomechanics.ch/SSBE/abstracts/22_Wunderli%20St._SSBE_2014.pdf | - SABER et al., Tisssue Eng. Part A, (20100000), vol. 16, pages 2085 - 2090 |