EP3350887 - LOW VOLTAGE BUSS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ideal Industries, Inc. Becker Place Sycamore, IL 60178 / US | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANTOUT, Alan Emad 365 Conlin Avenue Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 02 /
SWEDBERG, Benjamin David 101 Turner Place Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | 03 /
FILDES, Trevor Don 2203 Fairland Drive Sycamore, Illinois 60178 / US | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16847370.0 | 16.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016US52095 | Priority number, date | US201514857918 | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US201514857918 | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017049062 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3350887 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R25/14, H01R13/62, // H01R13/64 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H01R25/147 (EP,KR);
H01R13/6205 (EP,KR);
H01R25/142 (EP);
H01R13/64 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | H01R13/60, H01R11/30, H01R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Title | German: | NIEDERSPANNUNGS-BUSSYSTEM | [2018/30] | English: | LOW VOLTAGE BUSS SYSTEM | [2018/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BUS BASSE TENSION | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.09.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1032184 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]US3321730 (SCHLANGEN DONALD M) [X] 1-5 * figure 3 *; | [X]WO2008099306 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 3 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 5 *; | [X]US2009279298 (MIER-LANGNER ALEJANDRO [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2013335983 (NICIEJA ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]CN203398434U (RISING DISPLAY PRODUCTS ZHONGSHAN CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-5 * | International search | [XY]US2013335983 (NICIEJA ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * entire document * [Y] 4, 5; | [Y]US2014167501 (MAROSI JASON [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5 * entire document *; | [A]US2005250389 (JOHANSEN ARNOLD W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * entire document *; | [A]US2012295451 (HYUN-JUN KIM [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * entire document *; | [A]US2012208378 (RUDISILL CHARLES ALBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * entire document * | by applicant | CN203398434U | US2009279298 | WO2008099306 | US3321730 | US2013335983 | GB1032184 |