|
04.09.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
12.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2019 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
75 |