EP3355533 - PATH SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/31] | ROUTE SWITCHER | ||
[2020/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New H3C Technologies Co., Ltd. 466 Changhe Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jinglin New H3C Technologies Co., Ltd Oriental Electronic BLD. No.2 Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 16848149.7 | 23.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016CN99838 | Priority number, date | CN201510615709 | 24.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510615709 | [2018/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017050268 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355533 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3355533 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/703, H04L12/715, H04L12/707 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L45/74 (CN);
H04L45/745 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/54 (CN);
H04L45/64 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | H04L12/703 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROUTENSCHALTER | [2018/31] | English: | PATH SWITCHING | [2020/50] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE ROUTAGE | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/31] | ROUTE SWITCHER | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2018 | Translation filed | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2016 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | TR | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
TR | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2014131429 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,3-8,10-13 * page 9, lines 4-17 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 3 * * figure 5 * [Y] 2,9; | [YA]US2014269250 (BHIKKAJI BHARGAV [US], et al) [Y] 2,9 * column 4, lines 9-19 * * figure 1B *[A] 1,3-8,10-13 | International search | [Y]CN104270298 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * , claims 1-18 *; | [A]CN104348727 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN104639435 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * , claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2015215156 (YOON BIN YEONG [KR]) [A] 1-13* , the whole document * |