EP3333425 - VARIABLE OIL PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISODA, Atsuo c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16848433.5 | 19.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016JP74277 | Priority number, date | JP20150186541 | 24.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015186541 | [2018/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017051645 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333425 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333425 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00, F04C2/10, F04C14/22 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
F04C14/226 (EP,US);
F01C21/0863 (US);
F01M1/16 (US);
F04C15/0026 (EP);
F04C2/10 (US);
F04C2/102 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIABLE ÖLPUMPE | [2018/24] | English: | VARIABLE OIL PUMP | [2018/24] | French: | POMPE À HUILE VARIABLE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2018 | Translation filed | 05.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 05.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2016 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 02.10.2019 | |
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2738389 (YAMADA MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] ** paragraph [0085]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2014111798 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]WO2010013625 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , & US 2011/0014078 A1 & EP 2261508 A1 *; | [A]JP2014129807 (YAMADA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-6 * , & US 2014/0154120 A1 & EP 2738389 A1 *; | [A]JP2015140670 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-6* , & WO 2015/111482 A1 * |