EP3352725 - HIGH EFFICIENCY SUNSCREEN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deckner Consulting Services, LLC 10572 Tanager Hills Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKNER, George, Endel 10572 Tanager Hills Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | 02 /
HUSS, Nickolas 54 Park Avenue Maywood, NJ 07607 / US | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16849861.6 | 26.09.2016 | [2018/31] | WO2016US53762 | Priority number, date | US201562222923P | 24.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562222923 P | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017053959 | Date: | 30.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352725 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61K8/35, A61Q17/04, A61K8/11, A61K8/25, A61K8/37, A61K8/40, A61P17/16 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/0241 (US);
A61K8/042 (US);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/25 (EP);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/415 (US);
A61K8/4966 (US);
A61K8/8152 (US);
A61K8/8182 (US);
A61P17/16 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K2800/21 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | A61K8/18, A61K8/00, A61Q17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTE SONNENSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/31] | English: | HIGH EFFICIENCY SUNSCREEN COMPOSITION | [2018/31] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉCRAN SOLAIRE À HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 04.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US2006292095 (BIATRY BRUNO [FR], et al) [ID] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0488] - [0535] * * example -; claim - *; | [ID]US2014341981 (BERGERON VANCE [FR], et al) [ID] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] - [0017] * * figure -; example - *; | [I]US2015233871 (ZENG FANWEN [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO2015126874 (RP SCHERER TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0020]; claims 1, 4-8, 18, 19 * | International search | [X]US6436375 (LAPIDOT NOA [IL], et al) [X] 1-3, 9-12, 63-67, 73 * , entire document, especially abstract, col 2 In 27, col 2 In 59-62, col 3 In 66-67-col 4 In 3, col 4 In 2-3, col 4 In 24-30, col 4 In 49, col 5 In 7-12, col 6 In 63, col 10 In 62-65 *; | [Y]US2007086962 (BANDYOPADHYAY PRASUN [IN], et al) [Y] 1-3, 9-12, 63-67, 73 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2011236447 (YOSHIMURA MASANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3, 9-12, 63-67, 73 * , entire document *; | [Y]US5783174 (DECKNER GEORGE ENDEL [US]) [Y] 1-3, 9-12, 63-67, 73 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2006263402 (DECKNER GEORGE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 9-12, 63-67, 73 * , entire document * |