EP3357656 - CUTTING AND SEPARATING DEVICE APPLICABLE TO MANUAL CERAMIC CUTTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Germans Boada, S.A. Pol. Ind. Can Roses Avda. Olimpiades, s/n 08191 Rubi (Barcelona) / ES | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSELLÓ GARGALLO, Alex Pol.Ind.Can Roses Avda.Olimpiades s/n. 08191 Rubi, Barcelona / ES | [2020/42] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
ROSELLÓ GARGALLO, Alex Pol.Ind.Can Roses Avda.Olimpiades s/n. 08191 Rubi, Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 - 3 46018 Valencia / ES | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16850415.7 | 19.07.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016ES70543 | Priority number, date | ES20150031375 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: ES 201531375 | [2018/32] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017055650 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357656 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3357656 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/22 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
B28D1/225 (EP,ES,RU,US);
B28D1/228 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEID- UND TRENNVORRICHTUNG FÜR MANUELLE KERAMIKSCHNEIDER | [2018/32] | English: | CUTTING AND SEPARATING DEVICE APPLICABLE TO MANUAL CERAMIC CUTTERS | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE ET DE SÉPARATION UTILISABLE AVEC DES COUPE-CARREAUX MANUELS DE CÉRAMIQUE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 04.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2016 | AL | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MK | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 14.10.2020 | |
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]ES1044402U (BELLOTA HERRAMIENTAS SA [ES]) | International search | [A]ES1018011U ; | [A]EP0501053 (ISHII CHOKO KOGU SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]WO9508424 (DIAMANT BOART INC [US]); | [A]ES2101611 (BOADA GERMANS SA [ES]); | [A]ES1042563U (BOADA GERMANS SA [ES]) |