EP3357515 - PARTICLE COMPOSITION FOR EASY-TO-USE SOLID PREPARATION AND EASY-TO-USE SOLID PREPARATION INCLUDING SAID PARTICLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Corporation 3-1, Ofuka-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0011 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMASAKI, Momoko c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 02 /
OKABAYASHI, Tomohito c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 03 /
SAKAGUCHI, Anan c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 04 /
HIRAMURA, Takahiro c/o Daicel Corporation JR Shinagawa East Bldg. 18-1 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8230 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16851321.6 | 21.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP77883 | Priority number, date | JP20150192777 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015192777 | JP20160004123 | 13.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016004123 | JP20160080488 | 13.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016080488 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057147 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357515 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23L5/00, A61K9/20, A61K9/16, A61K9/50 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A23P20/105 (EP,US);
A61K9/286 (KR);
A61K9/28 (US);
A23L29/256 (US);
A23L29/262 (US);
A23L29/27 (US);
A23L33/125 (US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A23P10/22 (EP,US);
A23P10/28 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (KR);
A61K9/2054 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2072 (KR);
A61K9/2826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | A61K47/38, A23L5/00, A61K9/20, A61K47/10, A61K47/36, A61K47/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | PARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINFACH ANZUWENDENDE FESTE ZUBEREITUNG UND EINFACH ANZUWENDENDE FESTE ZUBEREITUNG MIT DIESER PARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/32] | English: | PARTICLE COMPOSITION FOR EASY-TO-USE SOLID PREPARATION AND EASY-TO-USE SOLID PREPARATION INCLUDING SAID PARTICLE COMPOSITION | [2018/32] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PARTICULES POUR PRÉPARATION SOLIDE FACILE À UTILISER, PRÉPARATION SOLIDE FACILE À UTILISER COMPRENANT LADITE COMPOSITION DE PARTICULES | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2018 | Translation filed | 17.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 17.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9920745 (IL YANG PHARM CO LTD [KR], et al); | [XI]JP2010260803 (TAKADA SEIYAKU KK); | [XI]WO2012075455 (APTALIS PHARMATECH INC [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JPS56100801 (ITT); | [Y]WO2006062089 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009203559 (DAICEL CHEM); | [Y]WO2011125798 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2015155386 (FREUNT IND CO LTD) |