EP3357685 - COSMETIC SHEET AND COSMETIC PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya Kagacho 1-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINBARA, Yuuhei c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya Kagacho 1-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2023/09] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
SHINBARA, Yuuhei c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya Kagacho 1-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851842.1 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP79007 | Priority number, date | JP20150194143 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015194143 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057673 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357685 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3357685 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/02, B32B27/20, B32B33/00, E04F15/12 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
E04F15/107 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/30 (KR,US);
B32B21/02 (EP);
B32B21/08 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/20 (KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B33/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/02 (US);
B44C1/10 (EP);
B44C5/04 (EP);
B44F1/02 (EP);
E04F13/002 (KR,US);
E04F13/0866 (EP,KR,US);
E04F13/16 (EP);
E04F13/18 (EP);
E04F15/102 (EP);
E04F15/105 (EP);
E04F15/12 (KR,US);
E04F15/16 (KR,US);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2255/08 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/28 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/4023 (EP);
B32B2307/406 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/538 (EP);
B32B2307/558 (EP);
B32B2307/584 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/756 (EP);
B32B2451/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2471/00 (KR,US);
B32B2607/00 (KR,US);
B32B37/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETIKFOLIE UND KOSMETIKPLATTE | [2018/32] | English: | COSMETIC SHEET AND COSMETIC PLATE | [2018/32] | French: | FEUILLE COSMÉTIQUE ET PLAQUE COSMÉTIQUE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 21.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | GB | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | LU | 30.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011111174 (NOMURA TSUMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0035] - [0037] *; | [A]WO2015105168 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0183] , [0279]; figures 1,3,6,7; claims 2,5,6,8-10,12 * | International search | [X]JP2002036446 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0045], [0055] (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2010234813 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , paragraph [0081]; examples 1 to 3 & WO 2006/035945 A1 & KR 10-2007-0065409 A & CN 101031418 A *; | [X]JP2012030525 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , examples 1 to 4, 7 to 10; comparative examples 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2014019719 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , claims 1 to 10; examples 1 to 4; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2014184675 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , comparative example 3 (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2015034462 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 5-6 * , paragraphs [0106], [0117] (Family: none) *[A] 3-4; | [X]JP2015077800 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * , paragraph [0037]; examples 1 to 6; comparative examples 1 to 6 (Family: none) * | Examination | US2008113182 | JP2014069507 |