EP3340160 - SMART GARMENT, USER TERMINAL, SYSTEM INCLUDING SAME, AND METHOD OF CHANGING DESIGN OF SMART GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyong Il 150 Jamwon-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06518 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Hyung Rae 11 Samjeon-ro 4-gil Songpa-gu Seoul 05593 / KR | 03 /
SOHN, Dong Hyun 277 Dongtanbanseok-ro Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18447 / KR | 04 /
HWANG, In Oh 227 Baekhyeon-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13600 / KR | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16851959.3 | 01.04.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016KR03403 | Priority number, date | KR20150139231 | 02.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150139231 | [2018/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057811 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340160 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/04, G06Q30/06, G06F17/30, H04N5/44, A41D27/08, G09G3/3208 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
D03D15/54 (EP,CN,US);
A41D1/002 (CN,US);
A41D15/00 (EP,CN,US);
A41D27/08 (EP,CN,US);
A41D31/0005 (EP,CN,US);
D01D5/30 (EP,CN);
D01F8/00 (EP,CN);
D03D1/0088 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/547 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/60 (US);
D03D15/67 (US);
G02F1/1313 (EP,CN);
G02F1/1333 (EP,CN);
G02F1/1334 (EP,CN);
G02F1/134309 (CN);
G02F1/155 (CN);
G02F1/167 (CN);
G02F1/16757 (CN);
G02F1/1676 (CN);
G06F3/0482 (CN);
G06F3/04842 (CN,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,CN,US);
G09G5/003 (EP,CN,US);
G09G5/006 (CN,US);
H04L67/12 (CN,US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N5/44 (EP,CN,US);
D10B2401/18 (EP,CN,US);
D10B2401/20 (EP,CN);
G02F2001/1555 (CN);
G02F2202/022 (EP,CN);
G09G2320/041 (EP,CN,US);
G09G2360/144 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK, BENUTZERENDGERÄT, SYSTEM DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÄNDERN DES DESIGNS EINES INTELLIGENTEN KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKS | [2018/26] | English: | SMART GARMENT, USER TERMINAL, SYSTEM INCLUDING SAME, AND METHOD OF CHANGING DESIGN OF SMART GARMENT | [2018/26] | French: | VÊTEMENT INTELLIGENT, TERMINAL UTILISATEUR, SYSTÈME LE COMPRENANT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHANGEMENT DE DESSIN DE VÊTEMENT INTELLIGENT | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2018 | Translation filed | 19.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 01.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP21175526.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003090598 (JOHNGREN JEANNE MULLER [US], et al); | [I]US2009310290 (TENNENT JAMES [CA]); | [A]US2010190440 (KIM JONG HWAN [KR]); | [A]EP2477166 (IGT RENO NEV [US]); | [XI]WO2014047185 (MILLER RESORT LLC [US]) | International search | [Y]KR20080032585 (TECHNOA INC [JP], et al); | [A]KR20100041406 (KIM SANG SIK [KR], et al); | [A]US2010151996 (ALTEN BRETT G [US], et al); | [Y]KR101142192B (LT ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20150106473 (LG UPLUS CORP [KR]) |