EP3355927 - DEVICES FOR SUPPORTING REGENERATION OF BODY TISSUES, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund 1430 Tulane Avenue SL-99 New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | For all designated states Nanofiber Solutions, LLC 5164 Blazer Pkwy Dublin, OH 43017 / US | For all designated states Waterman, Ruth 3974 Sorrento Valley Road 910133 San Diego, California 92191 / US | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund 1430 Tulane Avenue SL-99 New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | ||
For all designated states Nanofiber Solutions, Inc. 1275 Kinnear Road Colombus, OH 43212 / US | |||
For all designated states Waterman, Ruth 3974 Sorrento Valley Road 910133 San Diego, California 92191 / US | |||
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states The Administrators Of The Tulane Educational Fund 1430 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, Louisiana 70112 / US | ||
For all designated states Nanofiber Solutions, Inc. 1275 Kinnear Road Colombus, OH 43212 / US | |||
For all designated states Waterman, Ruth 3974 Sorrento Valley Road 910133 San Diego, California 92191 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DASHTI, Derek C. 16821 Falter Rd. Canyon Country, California 91387 / US | 02 /
BETANCOURT, Aline M. 3974 Sorrento Valley Road 910133 San Diego, California 92191 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Jed K. Nanofiber Solutions Inc. 1275 Kinnear Road Columbus, Ohio 43212 / US | 04 /
WATERMAN, Ruth 3974 Sorrento Valley Road 910133 San Diego, California 92191 / US | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Geling, Andrea ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2021/25] |
Former [2018/32] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16852794.3 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016US55035 | Priority number, date | US201562234744P | 30.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562234744 P | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017059377 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355927 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3355927 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K39/39, D04H1/728 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61L27/3691 (US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,US);
A61L27/3834 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (US);
A61L27/56 (US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
C12N5/0668 (US);
D04H1/728 (EP,US);
D04H3/011 (US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (US);
A61L2400/12 (EP,US);
A61L2430/22 (EP,US);
C12N2501/056 (US);
D10B2331/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (EP,US);
A61L27/26, C08L5/08 (US,EP);
A61L27/26, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER REGENERATION VON KÖRPERGEWEBEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2018/32] | English: | DEVICES FOR SUPPORTING REGENERATION OF BODY TISSUES, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THEM | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR ASSURER LA RÉGÉNÉRATION DE TISSUS DE L'ORGANISME, ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 27.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2016 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | ES | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | IT | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SE | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | TR | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | IE | 30.09.2021 | LU | 30.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
IE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2014017787 (BETANCOURT ALINE M [US]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0064] *; | [Y]US2015086607 (JOHNSON JED K [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] *; | [YD] - RUTH S. WATERMAN ET AL, "A New Mesenchymal Stem Cell (MSC) Paradigm: Polarization into a Pro-Inflammatory MSC1 or an Immunosuppressive MSC2 Phenotype", PLOS ONE, (20100426), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0010088, page e10088, XP055208782 [YD] 1-15 * Dicussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0010088 | [A] - J.Y. TAN ET AL, "Esophageal tissue engineering: An in-depth review on scaffold design", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20120101), vol. 109, no. 1, doi:10.1002/bit.23323, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1 - 15, XP055581260 [A] 1-15 * page 10 - page 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.23323 | International search | [Y]US8574567 (CRAWFORD KEITH D [US], et al) [Y] 1-11, 26-35 * col 3, Ins 1-4; col 10, Ins 5-6; col 17, Ins 44-55; col 23, Ins 16-25, col 44, Ins 11-16 *; | [Y]US2014023723 (LEACH J KENT [US], et al) [Y] 1-11, 26-35* paras [0033], [0083], [0108], [0333], [0425] *; | [Y]US2015086607 (JOHNSON JED K [US], et al) [Y] 1-11, 26-35 * paras [0023], [0024], [0032], * |