EP3360573 - MEDICINAL DRUG FOR PREVENTING OR INHIBITING ACUTE KIDNEY INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Cerebral and Cardiovascular Center 5-7-1, Fujishirodai Suita-shi Osaka 565-8565 / JP | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANGAWA, Kenji c/o NATIONAL CEREBRAL AND CARDIOVASCULAR CENTER 5-7-1 Fujishirodai Suita-shi Osaka 565-8565 / JP | 02 /
HOSODA, Hiroshi c/o NATIONAL CEREBRAL AND CARDIOVASCULAR CENTER 5-7-1 Fujishirodai Suita-shi Osaka 565-8565 / JP | 03 /
NOJIRI, Takashi c/o NATIONAL CEREBRAL AND CARDIOVASCULAR CENTER 5-7-1 Fujishirodai Suita-shi Osaka 565-8565 / JP | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16853615.9 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016JP79606 | Priority number, date | JP20150197921 | 05.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015197921 | JP20150252659 | 24.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015252659 | [2018/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017061461 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360573 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/18, A61K31/381, A61K31/44, A61K45/06, A61P13/12 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K45/00 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER HEMMUNG VON AKUTER NIERENLÄSION | [2018/33] | English: | MEDICINAL DRUG FOR PREVENTING OR INHIBITING ACUTE KIDNEY INJURY | [2018/33] | French: | MÉDICAMENT POUR PRÉVENIR OU INHIBER UNE INSUFFISANCE RÉNALE AIGUË | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2018 | Translation filed | 02.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 02.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008156142 (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 12, 13 * , claims 1 to 16; paragraph [0040] & US 2010/0228026 A1 claims 1 to 16; paragraph [0070] & EP 2172450 A1 & KR 10-2010-0023967 A & CN 101784520 A * [Y] 4, 5; | [PA]WO2015152393 (NAT CEREBRAL & CARDIOVASCULAR CT [JP], et al) [PA] 1-17 * , (Family: none) * | [XY] - MATAVELLI, L.C. et al., "Angiotensin AT 2 Receptor Stimulation Inhibits Early Renal Inflammation in Renovascular Hypertension", Hypertension, (20110000), vol. 57, no. 2, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 308 - 313, XP055080312 [X] 1, 10, 12-14, 16 * , particularly, Abstract, Figure 5 * [Y] 4, 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.110.164202 | [XY] - HRENAK, J. et al., "Protective Effect of Captopril, Olmesartan, Melatonin and Compound 21 on Doxorubicin-Induced Nephrotoxicity in Rats", Physiol.Res., (20130000), ISSN 0862-8408, pages S181 - S189, XP055373844 [X] 12, 13 * , particularly, Summary, S186, right column, line 3 to S187, left column, line 11 * [Y] 1-11, 14-17 | [Y] - OZKOK, A. et al., "Pathophysiology of Cisplatin- Induced Acute Kidney Injury", BioMed Research International, (20140000), vol. 2014, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 17, XP055373845 [Y] 1-11, 14-17 * , particularly, Table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/967826 | [X] - ISHIGURO, S. et al., "Involvement of angiotensin II type 2 receptor ( AT 2R) signaling in human pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma (PDAC): a novel AT 2R agonist effectively attenuates growth of PDAC grafts in mice", Cancer Biology & Therapy, (20150200), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 1538-4047, pages 307 - 316, XP055373847 [X] 6 * , particularly, Abstract, Figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15384047.2014.1002357 | [A] - DANYEL, L.A. et al., "Impact of AT 2-receptor stimulation on vascular biology, kidney function, and blood pressure", Integrated Blood Pressure Control, (20130000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.2147/IBPC.S34425, ISSN 1178-7104, pages 153 - 161, XP055373851 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/IBPC.S34425 | [A] - OKUI, S. et al., "Cisplatin-induced acute renal failure in mice is mediated by chymase- activated angiotensin-aldosterone system and interleukin-18", European Journal of Pharmacology, (20120000), vol. 685, pages 149 - 155, XP028489997 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2012.04.027 |