EP3360915 - NOVEL POLYSULFONE AMIDE COMPOUND, AND RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIZUMI, Takanori c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Functional Chemicals R & D Laboratories 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 02 /
KUMAGAI, Maki c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Functional Chemicals R & D Laboratories 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16853713.2 | 06.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016JP79836 | Priority number, date | JP20150199830 | 08.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015199830 | [2018/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017061561 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360915 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/30, C08L81/10, G03F7/038, G03F7/20 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C08G75/30 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0387 (EP,US);
C08L81/10 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/038 (KR,US);
G03F7/039 (US);
G03F7/0755 (EP);
G03F7/20 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE POLYSULFONAMIDVERBINDUNG UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2018/33] | English: | NOVEL POLYSULFONE AMIDE COMPOUND, AND RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME | [2018/33] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ D'AMIDE DE POLYSULFONE ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE LE CONTENANT | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2018 | Translation filed | 05.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 05.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3591559 (KWOLEK STEPHANIE LOUISE) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 28 * * column 2, lines 53-72 * * column 3, lines 18-27; examples 1-9; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US3708456 (KARDOS J) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 73 - column 5, line 38 *; | [X]US4623391 (SEITZ MICHAEL E A [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 8, lines 22-45; examples 1-6; claim 1 * * column 1, lines 10-17 * * column 3, lines 29-35 *; | [XI]JP2000331713 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0031] - [0045]; claims 1,4,5 *[I] 7; | [X]JP2004157235 (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0011] - [0022]; examples 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPS50132095 (Tohoku Hiryo Kabushiki Kaisha) [A] 1-8* , claims; page 3, upper right column, lines 1 to 12 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2000331713 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * , claims; paragraphs [0016], [0019], [0020], [0031], [0036], [0039], [0045] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001500178 (Eastman Chemical Co.) [A] 1-8 * , claims; pages 18 to 28 & US 6140517 A & WO 1998/010022 A1 claims; pages 11 to 28 & CN 1234054 A * |