EP3363555 - METHOD FOR JOINING MUTUAL MEMBERS CONSTITUTING FRAME STRUCTURE MOUNTED ON AUTOMOBILE, AND FRAME STRUCTURE MOUNTED ON AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMURA, Toru c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
KATSUMA, Hideto c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Yasuhiro c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 04 /
YUKISHIGE, Ryohei c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 16855484.8 | 13.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016JP80421 | Priority number, date | JP20150202963 | 14.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015202963 | [2018/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017065231 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3363555 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/06, B21D39/20, B21D53/88, B62D21/02 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
B21D39/044 (EP);
F16B5/0096 (US);
B21D39/03 (US);
B21D39/06 (EP,US);
B21D47/02 (US);
B21D53/88 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON GEGENSEITIGEN ELEMENTEN, DIE ÜBER EINE AN EIN AUTOMOBIL MONTIERTEN RAHMENSTRUKTUR VERFÜGEN, UND AN EINEM AUTOMOBIL MONTIERTE RAHMENSTRUKTUR | [2018/34] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING MUTUAL MEMBERS CONSTITUTING FRAME STRUCTURE MOUNTED ON AUTOMOBILE, AND FRAME STRUCTURE MOUNTED ON AUTOMOBILE | [2018/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'ÉLÉMENTS MUTUELS CONSTITUANT UNE STRUCTURE DE CADRE MONTÉE SUR AUTOMOBILE, ET STRUCTURE DE CADRE MONTÉE SUR AUTOMOBILE | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2018 | Translation filed | 29.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 29.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2006315676 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,8 * claims 1, 3, 4 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-7,9,10; | [XA]WO2009057673 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * claim 1 * * figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0187] * [A] 2-7,9,10; | [XAY]US2013026796 (WAGNER DAVID ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0036] * * figures 1, 2, 6, 10, 11 * [A] 2-5,7,9 [Y] 6,10; | [Y]JPS51133170 (NIKKEI ALUMINIUM SALES) [Y] 2 * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]JPH05212468 (KITAURA KOGYO KK) [Y] 3,9 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]JPS482318 (WESTINGNOUSE ELECTRIC CORP.) [Y] 4,9 * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]JP2005152920 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]JP2007222877 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0053] , [ 118] * | International search | [Y]JPS482318 (Westingnouse Electric Corp.) [Y] 4, 6-7, 9-10 * , page 2, upper left column, lines 2 to 8; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS51133170 (NIKKEI ALUMINIUM SALES) [Y] 2, 6-7, 9-10 * , page 2, upper left column, line 2 to upper right column, line 6; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]US4320568 (HERROD CLIVE A, et al) [Y] 2, 6-7, 9-10 * , column 3, line 30 to column 4, line 8; fig. 1 to 2 & GB 2069388 A & AU 6716581 A & CA 1133368 A & ZA 8100527 A & AU 542769 B *; | [Y]JPS61122388 (WERNER CO INC R D) [Y] 3, 6-7, 9-10 * , page 5, lines 1 to 10; fig. 1 to 8 & US 4656721 A fig. 1 to 8 & GB 2200678 A & DE 3704076 A & FR 2611802 A & BE 1000132 A & NL 8700435 A & SE 8500783 A & LU 86795 A & AU 593060 B & SE 8500783 AO *; | [Y]JPH05212468 (KITAURA KOGYO KK) [Y] 3, 6-7, 9-10 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0014]; fig. 3 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH09182923 (HINO MOTORS LTD, et al) [Y] 4, 6-7, 9-10 * , claim 1; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005152920 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 7* , paragraph [0024] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2006315676 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1, 8 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0005], [0013] to [0019]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-7, 9-10; | [Y]JP2007222877 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 5-7, 10 * , paragraphs [0048] to [0056], [0118]; fig. 17 & US 2010/0289300 A1 paragraphs [0145] to [0150]; fig. 17 & WO 2007/097310 A1 *; | [Y]US2013026796 (WAGNER DAVID ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 6-7, 10 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0030], [0044]; fig. 10 to 11 & US 2013/0026794 A1 & US 2013/0229005 A1 & US 2013/0264842 A1 & US 2013/0026793 A1 & DE 102012214558 A & DE 102012216495 A & CN 102963422 A & CN 103010305 A * |