EP3240005 - TOUCH SWITCH ATTACHABLE ON WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarus Korea Co., Ltd. 5 Myeonmok-ro 34-gil Jungnang-gu Seoul 02252 / KR | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Young Taik 201-1507 Samsung Apt. 217 Jeonnong-ro Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 02556 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Tae Kyun 17 Jong-ro 63ra-gil Jongno-gu Seoul 03113 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ki Bum 602 Greenpark Vile 42 Cheonho-daero 168da-gil Gangdong-gu Seoul 05383 / KR | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 16855595.1 | 01.06.2016 | [2017/44] | WO2016KR05811 | Priority number, date | KR20150143200 | 14.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150143200 | [2017/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017065377 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240005 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/96, F21V33/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/044 (EP,US);
G02F1/133308 (US);
G02F1/13338 (US);
G06F3/03547 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
H01H35/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | H01H35/00, H03K17/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | AN DER WAND ANBRINGBARER BERÜHRUNGSSCHALTER | [2017/44] | English: | TOUCH SWITCH ATTACHABLE ON WALL | [2017/44] | French: | COMMUTATEUR TACTILE POUVANT ÊTRE FIXÉ SUR UNE PAROI | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2017 | Translation filed | 28.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 29.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]JP2012174513 (DIGITAL ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 2-4, 6, 8-9 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0046], [0050] and figures 1-2. * [A] 1, 5, 7; | [Y]JP2005038796 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 2-4, 6, 8-9 * See paragraph [0034] and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20110011203 (KOREA DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEM [KR]) [Y] 6 * See paragraphs [0039]-[0041] and figure 2. *; | [A]US2013257315 (RESTREPO CARLOS EDUARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0055] and figures 2A-2D. *; | [A]US2011245940 (PICCO MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0055] and figure 7. * |