Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3362068 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3362068



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(57)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 311
25.10.2024 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.01.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.11.2023 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2023 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.2023 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
13.11.2023 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.07.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.07.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.07.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.07.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.07.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
03.07.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 33
04.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.05.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 33
04.05.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
04.05.2023 Description Search / examination 32
04.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.02.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.02.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.09.2021 Claims Search / examination 2
28.09.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2021 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.07.2021 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
22.07.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.07.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.07.2021 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.03.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.03.2021 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.03.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.12.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.12.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
23.10.2019 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
16.05.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
26.04.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.05.2018 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
24.05.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.04.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.04.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.02.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.05.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
20.04.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2017 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 35