EP3361991 - TRANSVALVULAR INTRAANNULAR BAND FOR MITRAL VALVE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heart Repair Technologies, Inc. 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Heart Repair Technologies, Inc 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HULME, Gary 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
REO, Michael, L. 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
AFZAL, Thomas 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Valavanur, A. 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
CHRISTIAN, Jeffrey 32 Anderson Way Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2018/34] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 16856213.0 | 13.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016US56900 | Priority number, date | US201562241687P | 14.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562241687 P | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017066480 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361991 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361991 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 20.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/2466 (EP);
A61F2/2454 (EP,US);
A61F2/2457 (EP,US);
A61F2/2487 (US);
A61F2210/0014 (US);
A61F2220/0016 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSVALVULARES INTRAANNULARES BAND FÜR DIE MITRALKLAPPENREPARATUR | [2018/34] | English: | TRANSVALVULAR INTRAANNULAR BAND FOR MITRAL VALVE REPAIR | [2018/34] | French: | BANDE INTRA-ANNULAIRE TRANSVALVULAIRE POUR RÉPARATION DE VALVULE MITRALE | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 18.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | GB | 13.10.2023 | LU | 13.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
GB | 13.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
GB | 13.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009228099 (RAHDERT DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-15* paragraph [0052]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2013090724 (SUBRAMANIAN VALAVANUR A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0118] , [0132] , [0175] , [0218]; figure - * | International search | [X]US2013090724 (SUBRAMANIAN VALAVANUR A [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * , fig. 20-21, 24-27, 43C-E, 56A, paragraphs [0117] - [0118], [0126] - [0128], [0134] - [0138], [0218] *; | [A]US2015223935 (SUBRAMANIAN VALAVANUR A [US], et al) [A] 1-13* , abstract *; | [A]US2015257884 (SUBRAMANIAN VALAVANUR A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * , abstract * | by applicant | US5976131 | US6168618 | US6468266 | US2009228099 | US2013090724 | - NIELSEN et al., "Influence of Anterior Mitral Leaflet Second-Order Chordae Tendineae on Left Ventricular Systolic Function", Circulation, (20030000), vol. 108, pages 486 - 491 | - NIELSEN et al., "Imbalanced chordal force distribution causes acute ischemic mitral regurgitation: Mechanistic insights from chordae tendineae force measurements in pigs", J Thorac Cardiovasc Surg, (20050000), vol. 129, doi:10.1016/j.jtcvs.2004.07.044, pages 525 - 31, XP004863368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtcvs.2004.07.044 |