EP3367376 - SHIFT REGISTER UNIT, GATE DRIVE DEVICE, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Hyun Sic No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Seung Woo No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 16856809.5 | 28.09.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016CN100657 | Priority number, date | CN201510684372 | 20.10.2015 Original published format: CN201510684372 | [2018/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017067376 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367376 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
G11C19/188 (EP,US);
G11C19/186 (US);
G09G3/2092 (US);
G09G3/3677 (EP,US);
G11C19/287 (US);
G09G2310/0286 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | SCHIEBEREGISTEREINHEIT, GATE-ANSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/35] | English: | SHIFT REGISTER UNIT, GATE DRIVE DEVICE, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND CONTROL METHOD | [2018/35] | French: | UNITÉ DE REGISTRE À DÉCALAGE, DISPOSITIF DE PILOTAGE DE GRILLE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | Translation filed | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009256749 (FALK KENT [SE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]CN102867543 (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al) [X] 1-12* the whole document * |