EP3367105 - NANO-FLUID DEVICE AND CHEMICAL ANALYSIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZOE Yutaka c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 02 /
PIHOSH Yuriy c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 1138654 / JP | 03 /
KITAMORI Takehiko c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 1138654 / JP | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16857569.4 | 21.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016JP81315 | Priority number, date | JP20150209235 | 23.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015209235 | [2018/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017069256 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367105 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, F16K99/00, B81B1/00 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
B01L3/502738 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B81B1/00 (EP,US);
B82B1/001 (US);
B82B3/0019 (US);
F16K99/0015 (EP,US);
G01N35/08 (EP,US);
G01N37/00 (EP,US);
B01L2200/06 (US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0896 (EP,US);
B01L2300/123 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | G01N35/08, B81B1/00, G01N37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | NANO-FLUID-VORRICHTUNG UND CHEMISCHE ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/35] | English: | NANO-FLUID DEVICE AND CHEMICAL ANALYSIS APPARATUS | [2018/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR FLUIDE NANOMÉTRIQUE ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE CHIMIQUE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2018 | Translation filed | 17.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 17.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005031494 (HARMS MICHAEL R [US], et al); | [X]US2010159462 (TAKAYAMA SHUICHI [US], et al); | [X]US2010247384 (TAKAYAMA SHUICHI [US], et al); | [A]US2011240127 (EBERHART DAVID [US], et al); | [X]US2014193896 (COHEN DAVID S [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2009168216 (NAGANO KEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011047708 (FUJIKURA KASEI KK) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2011/0120580 A1 & US 2013/0294982 A1 & EP 2352036 A1 & CN 102150048 A *; | [A]WO2011067961 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* , & US 2012/0298511 A1 & EP 2508253 A1 & KR 10-2012-0096012 A & CN 102725060 A *; | [A]JP2011524815 (Boehringer Ingelheim microParts GmbH) [A] 1-9 * , & US 2011/0135546 A1 & WO 2009/156045 A2 & EP 2138233 A1 & KR 10-2011-0021999 A & CN 102112229 A *; | [A]JP2014240065 (UNIV OSAKA PREFECTURE) [A] 1-9 * , (Family: none) * |