EP3365862 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUCTION CUSTOMER ENGAGEMENT PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dropit Limited 41 Totara Street Mount Maunganui, Tauranga 3116 / NZ | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWELL, Brendan Roderick PO Box 13362 Tauranga Central 3110 / NZ | 02 /
HOWELL, Peter John PO Box 13362 Tauranga Central 3110 / NZ | [2018/40] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
HOWELL, Brendan Roderick 1 Totara Street Mount Maunganui Tauranga 3116 / NZ | ||
02 /
HOWELL, Peter John 1 Totara Street Mount Maunganui Tauranga 3116 / NZ | Representative(s) | Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16857864.9 | 20.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016NZ50172 | Priority number, date | NZ15713482 | 20.10.2015 Original published format: NZ 15713482 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017069639 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365862 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/08, G06F3/0488 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | G06Q30/08, G06Q30/06, G06F3/0484, G06Q20/32, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTEIGERUNGSKUNDENBINDUNGSPLATTFORM | [2018/35] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUCTION CUSTOMER ENGAGEMENT PLATFORM | [2018/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE PLATEFORME DE PARTICIPATION DE CLIENT DE VENTE AUX ENCHÈRES | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 15.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2009299906 (MOSHAL DAVID C [US]) [Y] 1-25 * See abstract, paragraphs [0053],[0061],[0066],[0076]-[0077],[0082],[0084], [0100],[0107], claims 1,17 and figures 1,7-8,13,16-17. *; | [Y]US7895087 (GOTTLIEB HARRY N [US]) [Y] 1-25 * See abstract, column 29, lines 4-36, claim 1 and figures 1A-1N. *; | [Y]US2014214584 (DORFI JOHANN [MX]) [Y] 1-25 * See abstract, paragraph [0031], claims 1,4-5,8-10 and figures 2a-3c,7. *; | [Y]US2015213531 (KUNG WILLIAM K [US]) [Y] 14-17, 19-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0025],[0030], claims 1,10 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2012116909 (SAENZ JULIO CESAR [US]) [A] 1-25 * See claims 1-9 and figures 1-4. *; | [A]KR20070051453 (SOTHEBY ONLINE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-25 * See claims 1-15 and figures 1-5,7-8. * Note: Since the present application contains two inventions, this written opinion and the ISR have been established based on a first claim set at pages 19-22. * |