EP3284452 - EXOSKELETON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Limited Liability Company "Exoatlet" 1-j Truzhenikov per., 15, ofis 1 Moscow 119121 / RU | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEREZIY, Ekaterina Sergeevna ul. Obrucheva, 20, kv. 47 Moscow 117421 / RU | 02 /
PISMENNAYA, Elena Valentinovna Michurinskij pr-t, 54, k.3, kv.71 Moscow 119192 / RU | 03 /
KUZMICHEV, Andrey Viktorovich ul. Bakinskaja 4, kv. 75 Moscow 115516 / RU | 04 /
LAVROVSKIY, Eduard Kirovich ul. Strojkovskaja, 6, kv. 152 Moscow 109316 / RU | [2020/46] |
Former [2018/08] | 01 /
BEREZIJ, Ekaterina Sergeevna ul. Obrucheva, 20, kv. 47 Moscow 117421 / RU | ||
02 /
PIS'MENNAJA, Elena Valentinovna Michurinskij pr-t, 54, k.3, kv.71 Moscow 119192 / RU | |||
03 /
KUZMICHEV, Andrej Viktorovich ul. Bakinskaja 4, kv. 75 Moscow 115516 / RU | |||
04 /
LAVROVSKIJ, Eduard Kirovich ul. Strojkovskaja, 6, kv. 152 Moscow 109316 / RU | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16857866.4 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016RU00448 | Priority number, date | RU20150144703 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: RU 2015144703 | [2018/08] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017069652 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | RU | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284452 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3284452 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/00 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
A61H1/0262 (EP,KR);
A61H3/00 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/0006 (KR,US);
A61B5/11 (KR);
A61H3/008 (US);
A61H2003/007 (EP);
A61H2201/1207 (EP);
A61H2201/1215 (KR);
A61H2201/1481 (US);
A61H2201/1602 (US);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
A61H2201/165 (KR);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (KR,US);
A61H2201/501 (EP);
A61H2201/5035 (KR);
A61H2201/5069 (EP,KR,US);
A61H2201/5079 (EP,KR);
A61H2201/5084 (EP,US);
A61H2230/62 (KR);
A61H2230/625 (EP);
G05B2219/40305 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXOSKELETT | [2018/08] | English: | EXOSKELETON | [2018/08] | French: | EXOSQUELETTE | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2017 | Translation filed | 14.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 14.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2016 | AL | 11.11.2020 | AT | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | ES | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | IT | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | NL | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SE | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | NO | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | IE | 18.07.2021 | LU | 18.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 18.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.07.2021 | ||
LU | 18.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 18.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7125388 (REINKENSMEYER DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 21 - column 12, line 32; figure 15A *; | [A]EP1842518 (SANKAI YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]RU2364385 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]WO2014113456 (EKSO BIONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-8D *; | [A]US2015025423 (CAIRES THIAGO [CA], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [DA]RU2364385 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP]) [DA] 1-9; | [A]US2015025423 (CAIRES THIAGO [CA], et al)[A] 1-9 |