EP3365477 - METHOD FOR CORROSION INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/35] | CORROSION INHIBITION | ||
[2023/27] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89m 2514 JG The Hague / NL | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, Lynne Patricia Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 02 /
BARMATOV, Evgeny Borisovich Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 03 /
HUGHES, Trevor Lloyd Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 04 /
HO, Man Yi Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambrdige Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16858033.0 | 17.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US57259 | Priority number, date | GB20150018417 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: GB 201518417 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070026 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365477 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/14, C23F11/04, C09K8/54, // C07D209/08, C07D209/14, C07D295/03, C07D215/06, C07D215/08 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
C23F11/04 (EP,GB,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D209/14 (EP,US);
C07D215/06 (EP,US);
C07D215/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/03 (EP,US);
C09K8/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | C23F11/14, C23F11/04, C09K8/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR KORROSIONSHEMMUNG | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD FOR CORROSION INHIBITION | [2023/27] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR L' INHIBITION DE LA CORROSION | [2023/27] |
Former [2018/35] | KORROSIONSHEMMUNG | ||
Former [2018/35] | CORROSION INHIBITION | ||
Former [2018/35] | INHIBITION DE LA CORROSION | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 18.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0187322 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0243982 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP0623598 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO9602508 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO0123374 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al); | [X]WO0242248 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO03105849 (RHEOGENE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2004065351 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2006035954 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2007291079 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD); | International search | [A]US4698168 (BRIGGS GARRY L [CA]) [A] 1-4 * See abstract; columns 2-4; table 1. *; | [X]US5120471 (JASINSKI RAYMOND J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * See abstract; column 4. *; | [X]JP2000038689 (ASAHI KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * See abstract; paragraphs [0001], [0011], [0014]-[0015]. *; | [X]US2013112106 (MALWITZ MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * See abstract; claims 1-19; paragraphs [0021], [0034]. *; | [A]US2014027675 (MATULEWICZ WILLIAM N [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * See abstract; claim 1. *; | [A]US2015152329 (SEETHARAMAN JOTHIBASU [IN], et al) [A] 1-4* See claims 10-11; paragraphs [0031]-[0034], [0087]-[0088]. * | by applicant | EP0243982 | US5120471 | JP2000038689 | WO2004065351 | US7777038 | US2013112106 | - PIRKLE et al., "Chromatographic Separation of the Enantiomers of N-Acylated Heterocyclic Amines", J. Org. Chem., (19840000), vol. 49, doi:10.1021/jo00187a043, pages 2504 - 2506, XP002334946 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00187a043 | - SCHMITT, G.BEDBUR, K., "Investigations on structural and electronic effects in acid corrosion inhibitors by AC impedance", Werkstoffe und Korrosion, (19850000), vol. 36, pages 273 - 278, XP001306848 |