EP3364976 - PIPERAZINYL NORBENZOMORPHAN COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Stephen F. 5316 Tortuga Trail Austin, Texas 78731 / US | 02 /
SAHN, James J. 7101 East Wind Drive Apt. 3212 Austin, Texas 78712 / US | 03 /
HODGES, Timothy R. c/o Vanderbilt University School of Medicine Department of Biochemistry 2215 Garland Ave., 607 Light Hall Nashville, TN 37232-0146 / US | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
MARTIN, Stephen F. 5316 Tortuga Trail Austin, Texas 78731 / US | ||
02 /
SAHN, James J. 7101 East Wind Drive Apt. 3212 Austin, Texas 78712 / US | |||
03 /
HODGES, Timothy R. 106 E. 30th Street Apt. 102 Austin, Texas 78705 / US | Representative(s) | Rückerl, Florian Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16858145.2 | 19.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US57739 | Priority number, date | US201562243568P | 19.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562243568 P | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070229 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364976 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, C07D471/06, A61P25/00, A61P35/00 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP,US);
A61P25/22 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | A61K31/496, C07D471/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | PIPERAZINYL-NORBENZOMORPHAN-VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/35] | English: | PIPERAZINYL NORBENZOMORPHAN COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME | [2018/35] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PIPÉRAZINYL NORBENZOMORPHANE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015009742 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,12-15 * page 49, paragraph 171; table A * * page 109, paragraph 374 - paragraph 376 * * page 3, paragraph 11 *[I] 4,10,11; | [X] - JAMES J. SAHN ET AL, "Expedient Synthesis of Norbenzomorphan Library via Multicomponent Assembly Process Coupled with Ring-Closing Reactions", ACS COMBINATORIAL SCIENCE, US, (20120910), vol. 14, no. 9, doi:10.1021/co300068a, ISSN 2156-8952, pages 496 - 502, XP055313866 [X] 1-3,5-9,12-14 * Entry 4; page 499; table 1; compounds 20 {2,1} * * entry 5; page 500; table 5; compounds 38 {2,1,9}, 38 {2,1,13}, 38 {2,1,18} * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/co300068a | International search | [Y]US2011082154 (OKSENBERG DONNA [US], et al) [Y] 40/1-29, 41/40/1-29, 42/40/1-29, 43/40/1-29, 44/40/1-29, 45/40/1-29, 46/40/1-29* ; paragraphs [0015], [0020], [0022] *; | [XY]WO2015009742 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-29, 30/7-29, 31/7-29, 39/7-29, 47/7-29, 48/7-29, 49/47/7-29, 50/47/7-29, 1/47/7-29, 52/47/7-29 * ; paragraphs [0006], [0010]-[0011], [0027], [0031], [0034], [0039], [0068], [0110]-[0111], [0115]-[0116], [0169], [0214], [0217], [0239], [0241], [0243], [0290] * [Y] 40/1-29, 41/40/1-29, 42/40/1-29, 43/40/1-29, 44/40/1-29, 45/40/1-29, 46/40/1-29 |