EP3364899 - ARTHROSCOPIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/35] | ARTHROSCOPIC DEVICES AND METHODS | ||
[2023/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Relign Corporation 655 Campbell Technology Parkway Suite 275 Campbell, California 95008 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/14] | For all designated states Relign Corporation 655 Campbell Technology Parkway Suite 275 Campbell, California 95008 / US | ||
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Relign Corporation 1601 South De Anza Boulevard, Suite 221 Cupertino CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Germain, Aaron 3122 Hilary Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 02 /
Klein, Kyle 816 Sevin Terrace San Jose, CA 95133 / US | 03 /
Walker, Michael, D. 177 Texas Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
Poser, Ben 220 Center Street 3 Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Mays, Julie Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2018/35] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16858321.9 | 21.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US58179 | Priority number, date | US201562245796P | 23.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562245796 P | US201562250315P | 03.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562250315 P | US201514977256 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: US201514977256 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070510 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364899 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3364899 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56, A61B17/16, A61B18/14, A61B17/32, // A61B18/00, A61B17/00, A61B17/22 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A61B18/149 (EP,US);
A61B17/1615 (EP,US);
A61B17/1626 (EP,US);
A61B17/1628 (US);
A61B17/1631 (US);
A61B17/1633 (EP,US);
A61B17/1637 (US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B18/148 (EP,US);
A61B18/1482 (US);
A61B18/1485 (US);
A61B2017/00039 (US);
A61B2017/0023 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (US);
A61B2017/00836 (US);
A61B2017/0088 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22079 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320028 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/142 (US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | A61B17/56, A61B17/16, A61B18/14, A61B17/32, // A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/35] | A61B18/00, A61B18/04, A61B18/08, A61B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTHROSKOPISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/21] | English: | ARTHROSCOPIC DEVICES | [2023/21] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ARTHROSCOPIQUES | [2023/21] |
Former [2018/35] | ARTHROSKOPISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2018/35] | ARTHROSCOPIC DEVICES AND METHODS | ||
Former [2018/35] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS ARTHROSCOPIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 13.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2012330292 (SHADDUCK JOHN H [US], et al); | [X]US2014336643 (ORCZY-TIMKO BENEDEK [HU], et al); | [L]WO2016171963 (ORCZY-TIMKO BENEDEK [HU], et al); | [E]WO2017136414 (RELIGN CORP [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4895146 (DRAENERT KLAUS [DE]); | [A]US5823971 (ROBINSON DONALD E [US], et al); | [A]US6261241 (BURBANK FRED H [US], et al); | [A]US2006074345 (HIBNER JOHN A [US]); | [A]US2008188848 (DEUTMEYER KURT M [US], et al); | [XY]US2013296847 (GERMAIN AARON [US], et al); |