EP3365666 - CHARACTERIZING GASTROINTESTINAL FUNCTIONS FROM SURFACE ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY RECORDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLEMAN, Todd, Prentice 8760 Caminito Abrazo La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
GHARIBANS, Armen 12815 Via Nieve Unit 56 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 16858460.5 | 24.10.2016 | [2018/35] | WO2016US58534 | Priority number, date | US201562245441P | 23.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562245441 P | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017070700 | Date: | 27.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3365666 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, C12M1/34, A61B5/0488, A61B5/0492, // A61B5/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/721 (EP,US);
A61B5/392 (EP,US);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/42 (EP,US);
A61B5/6823 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61B5/7225 (EP,US);
A61B5/725 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/04 (EP,US);
A61B5/0075 (EP,US);
A61B5/7253 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | G01N27/00, C12M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] | Title | German: | CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON MAGEN-DARM-FUNKTIONEN AUS ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENAUFZEICHNUNGEN | [2018/35] | English: | CHARACTERIZING GASTROINTESTINAL FUNCTIONS FROM SURFACE ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY RECORDING | [2018/35] | French: | CARACTÉRISATION DES FONCTIONS GASTRO-INTESTINALES À PARTIR D'UN ENREGISTREMENT D'ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIE DE SURFACE | [2018/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 23.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5795304 (SUN HUN H [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1B, 5-7, 15-19 * | International search | [XY]US2013046150 (DEVANABOYINA UDAYA SANKAR [US]) [X] 1, 2, 4, 10, 14, 15 * , entire document, especially para. [0045], [0047], [0048], [0051], [0053], [0055], FIG. 4 * [Y] 3, 5-9, 11-13, 16, 17; | [Y]US2015289822 (DUGAN STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 3 * , para. [0235] *; | [Y]US2010298741 (GROSS YOSSI [IL], et al) [Y] 5 * , para. [0053], [0187][0188] *; | [Y]US2011295096 (BIBIAN STEPHANE [US], et al) [Y] 6-9, 12, 13 * , para. [0043], [0089], FIG. 7 *; | [Y]US2011106203 (MARKOWITZ H TOBY [US], et al) [Y] 11 * , para. [0023]-[0024] *; | [Y]US2006173364 (CLANCY EDWARD A [US], et al) [Y] 16 * , para. [0035] *; | [Y]US2008139953 (BAKER STEVEN D [US], et al) [Y] 17 * , para. [0044]-[0045], FIG. 1A-D * |