EP3370385 - PACKET FORWARDING APPLIED TO VXLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New H3C Technologies Co., Ltd. 466 Changhe Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Dimin Room 211, Oriental Electronic BLD. No.2, Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16858982.8 | 25.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016CN103152 | Priority number, date | CN201510701615 | 26.10.2015 Original published format: CN201510701615 | [2018/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017071547 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3370385 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3370385 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L61/103, H04L9/40, H04L101/622 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04L61/103 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (US);
H04L49/552 (US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L2101/622 (EP);
H04L2212/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF VXLAN ANGEWENDETE PAKETWEITERLEITUNG | [2018/36] | English: | PACKET FORWARDING APPLIED TO VXLAN | [2018/36] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE PAQUET APPLIQUÉ À UN VXLAN | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2018 | Translation filed | 26.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 26.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013318219 (KANCHERLA MANI PRASAD [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] , [0 50] , [0 56] , [0 72] , [0 74] , [0 75] * * figures 5A, 5B * * claims 1,7 *; | [X]US2015281067 (WU TIANYI [CN]) [X] 3-5,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 6] - [0010] - [0 13] , [0 14] , [0 17] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 27] - [0042] - [0 67] - [0084] * * paragraphs [0169] - [0189] * * claims 1-16 ** figures 1-7b * |