EP3368537 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING IBRUTINIB AND ITS INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ScinoPharm Taiwan, Ltd. No. 1, Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSIAO, Tsung-Yu No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | 02 /
HO, Mengfen No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | 03 /
TSENG, Hsinchang No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | 04 /
TSAO, Wenshing No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | 05 /
HUANG, Yuanchang No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | 06 /
LO, Wei-Shuo No. 1 Nan-Ke 8th Road Southern Taiwan Science Park Shan-Hua Tainan 74144 / TW | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16860399.1 | 28.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016SG50528 | Priority number, date | US201562285035P | 28.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562285035 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074265 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368537 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D401/04, A61K31/519, C07F9/6561 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (KR,US);
C07F9/6561 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | C07D487/04, C07D401/04, A61K31/519 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IBRUTINIB UND SEINEN ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN | [2018/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING IBRUTINIB AND ITS INTERMEDIATES | [2018/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'IBRUTINIB ET DE SES INTERMÉDIAIRES | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 10.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2018 | Observations by third parties | 06.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]WO2016127915 (SHANGHAI DUDE MEDICAL SCIENCE AND TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [XP] 1-5,16 * examples 17, 18 * [A] 6-15; | [A]EP1780210 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * reference example 10 * | International search | [XYA]WO2015145415 (PERRIGO API LTD [IL]) [X] 26-29, 34-36 * See abstract; claims 59, 60, 82, 85; paragraph [00139]; figure 11. * [Y] 30-33 [A] 1-25; | [A]CN104557945 (ARROMAX PHARMATECH CO LTD) [A] 1-36 * See the whole document. *; | [A]CN103121999 (SUZHOU DEVI PHARMA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-36 * See the whole document. *; | [A]WO2015074464 (SUZHOU MIRACPHARMA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-36 * See the whole document. *; | [PX]WO2016115869 (HEFEI INST PHYSICAL SCI CAS [CN], et al) [PX] 24 * See page 25, compound 2. * | [XYA] - LIU, N. et al., "Direct and two-step bioorthogonal probes for Bruton' s tyrosine kinase based on ibrutinib: a comparative study", Organic & Biomolecular Chemistry, (20150327), vol. 13, no. 18, pages 5147 - 5157, XP055249951 [X] 1-13 * See abstract; page 5152, left column; scheme 1; figure 1. * [Y] 30-33 [A] 14-29, 34-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5OB00474H |