EP3369057 - WASTE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM HAVING VENDOR OPPORTUNITY PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rubicon Global Holdings, LLC 5909 Peachtree Dunwoody Road Suite 200-D Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODONI, Philip 5909 Peachtree Dunwoody Road Suite 200-D Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16860432.0 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US42761 | Priority number, date | US201562247582P | 28.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562247582 P | US201662306277P | 10.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662306277 P | US201615185475 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: US201615185475 | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074527 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369057 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q20/10, G06Q30/06, G06Q10/00, H04W8/18 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/30 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US);
Y02W90/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | G06Q10/10, G06Q20/10, G06Q30/06, H04W8/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | ABFALLENTSORGUNGSSYSTEM MIT ANBIETERGELEGENHEITSPLATTFORM | [2018/36] | English: | WASTE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM HAVING VENDOR OPPORTUNITY PLATFORM | [2018/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DÉCHETS AVEC PLATEFORME D'OPPORTUNITÉS POUR VENDEURS | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/39] | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008162191 (SMITH CHARLOTTE A [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-11 *; | [I]US2012191558 (KILIMNICK JEFFREY A [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; figures 1-8 *; | [I]US2013041832 (RODATOS CONSTANTINE D [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-31 *; | [I]WO2014079586 (ENEVO OY [FI]) [I] 1-15 * page 10, line 10 - page 14, line 8; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US2009070233 (BRUNSWIG FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2009216612 (PYLE CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * ; abstract; figures 1, 2-3, 7, 11; paragraphs [0003], [0026]-[0029], [0035], [0037], [0040]-[0042], [0049], [0053], [0055]-[0056], [0066], [0068] *; | [A]US2013041832 (RODATOS CONSTANTINE D [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2013132233 (ROTHLEY MARTINA [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [Y]WO2014079586 (ENEVO OY [FI]) [Y] 1-20 * ; abstract; figure 1; page 5, line 1; page 6, lines 8-24; page 9, lines 12-17; page 10, line 34 to page 11, line 8; page 16, lines 2-7, 10; page 18, lines 4-20, 16-17; page 21, lines 26-29; page 22, line 4; page 23, lines 14-15, 21-23 *; | [Y]US2014279429 (HOLMAN PABLOS [US], et al) [Y] 4, 13 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0089], [0171], [0222], [0234], [0247] * |