EP3369002 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING CUSTOMER INTENT PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states [24]7.ai, Inc. 2001 Logic Drive, Suite 200 San Jose, CA 95124 / US | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states 24/7 Customer, Inc. 910 E. Hamilton Avenue Suite 240 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALIA, Anmol 910 E. Hamilton Ave. Suite 240 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16860706.7 | 26.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US58908 | Priority number, date | US201562246544P | 26.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562246544 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017075081 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369002 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G06F16/332, H04M3/51, H04M3/527, H04M7/00 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H04M3/5166 (EP,US);
G06F40/35 (EP,US);
G06F16/3329 (EP,US);
G06F16/3335 (EP,US);
G06F40/129 (US);
G06F40/232 (US);
G06F40/242 (US);
G06F40/295 (EP,US);
H04M3/527 (EP,US);
H04M7/0045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | G06F17/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER VORHERSAGE VON KUNDENABSICHTEN | [2018/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING CUSTOMER INTENT PREDICTION | [2018/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FACILITER UNE PRÉDICTION D'INTENTION DE CLIENT | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 25.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015286747 (ANASTASAKOS TASOS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0072]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0111] - [0138] * * paragraphs [0180] - [0190]; figures 6,7 * [I] 3-13; | [A]US2013080149 (MCCOMBS PETER [US], et al) [A] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0147] * | [A] - ERIC BRILL ET AL, "An improved error model for noisy channel spelling correction", ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, N. EIGHT STREET, STROUDSBURG, PA, 18360 07960-1961 USA, (20001003), doi:10.3115/1075218.1075255, pages 286 - 293, XP058177321 [A] 10-13 * abstract * * Sections 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3115/1075218.1075255 | International search | [Y]US2015288818 (SRIVASTAVA VAIBHAV [IN], et al) [Y] 1-34 * entire document (especially para [0031], para [0040]-[0041], para [0048], para [0050]-[0052], *; | [Y]US2014149121 (DI FABBRIZIO GIUSEPPE [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * entire document (especially para [0041], para [0063]) *; | [Y]US2010180198 (IAKOBASHVILI ROBERT [IL], et al) [Y] 11-14, 26-28, 31-33 * entire document (especially para [0025]) *; | [A]US2015269125 (DESAI ADITI [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * entiire document * |