EP3368312 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/36] | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seurat Technologies, Inc. 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMUTH, James A. 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
TOOMRE, Erik 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
LEARD, Francis L. 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
KAMSHAD, Kourosh 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
FEES, Heiner 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 06 /
BERDICHEVSKY, Eugene 1060 La Avenida St. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 16860817.2 | 27.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016US59188 | Priority number, date | US201562248829P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248829 P | US201562248841P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248841 P | US201562248835P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248835 P | US201562248776P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248776 P | US201562248765P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248765 P | US201562248980P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248980 P | US201562248795P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248795 P | US201562248969P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248969 P | US201562248848P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248848 P | US201562248783P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248783 P | US201562248966P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248966 P | US201562248780P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248780 P | US201562248821P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248821 P | US201562248989P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248989 P | US201562248833P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248833 P | US201562248799P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248799 P | US201562248968P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248968 P | US201562248791P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248791 P | US201562248787P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248787 P | US201562248758P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248758 P | US201562248770P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248770 P | US201562248847P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248847 P | US201562248839P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248839 P | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017075258 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368312 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3368312 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/28, B22F10/34, B22F10/36, B22F10/70, B22F12/17, B22F12/88, B22F12/90, B23K15/00, B23K26/08, B23K26/342, B28B1/00, B29C64/268, B29C64/379, B33Y10/00, B33Y40/00, G02F1/01, // G02B27/09, G02B27/28 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B23K37/0408 (EP,IL,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/268 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/264 (IL,US);
B22F10/00 (IL,US);
B22F10/10 (IL,US);
B22F10/34 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/36 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/38 (KR);
B22F10/39 (EP,KR);
B22F10/47 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/50 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/70 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F10/85 (KR);
B22F12/00 (US);
B22F12/17 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B22F12/222 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/226 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/30 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/33 (IL,KR,US);
B22F12/38 (IL,KR,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/70 (IL,KR,US);
B22F12/88 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B22F3/24 (IL,US);
B23K15/0006 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0013 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/002 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0026 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0086 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/0093 (EP,IL,US);
B23K15/06 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/0006 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/03 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/032 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/083 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/0846 (IL,US);
B23K26/1224 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/123 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/127 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/142 (IL,US);
B23K26/144 (IL,US);
B23K26/16 (IL,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B23K26/36 (IL,US);
B23K26/702 (IL,US);
B23K26/703 (EP,IL,US);
B23K26/704 (EP,IL,US);
B23K37/0426 (IL,US);
B25J11/00 (IL,US);
B28B1/001 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/286 (KR);
B29C64/35 (EP,CN,IL);
B29C64/357 (EP,CN,IL);
B29C64/379 (EP,CN,IL);
B29C64/386 (IL,US);
B29C64/393 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (IL,US);
B33Y99/00 (IL,US);
G02B15/04 (IL,US);
G02B15/10 (IL,US);
G02B19/0028 (IL,US);
G02B19/0047 (IL,KR,US);
G02B26/0816 (IL,US);
G02B27/0068 (IL,US);
G02B27/0905 (EP,IL,US);
G02B27/141 (IL,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B27/286 (EP,IL,US);
G02B7/14 (IL,US);
G02B7/16 (IL,US);
G02B7/1827 (IL,US);
G02F1/0136 (EP,IL,US);
G02F1/133362 (IL,US);
G02F1/135 (IL,US);
G05B17/02 (IL,US);
G07C3/146 (EP,IL,US);
H01S5/005 (IL,KR,US);
H01S5/4012 (IL,US);
B22F10/32 (EP,IL,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,IL,US);
B22F10/73 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/20 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,IL,US);
B22F12/45 (EP,IL,US);
B22F2003/247 (IL,KR,US);
B22F2003/248 (IL,KR,US);
B22F2203/03 (IL);
B22F2998/10 (IL,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B23K2101/001 (IL,US);
B23K2101/008 (EP,IL,US);
B23K2101/02 (IL,US);
B23K2101/24 (IL,US);
B23K2103/00 (EP,IL,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,IL,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,IL,US);
B29K2105/251 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B27/108 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/00, B22F2203/03 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/20, B22F2203/03 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F12/41, B22F2203/03 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/02, B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2022/15] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2022/15] |
Former [2018/36] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | ||
Former [2018/36] | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2018/36] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.04.2022 | 01.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22195605.5 / EP4137256 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2016 | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | BG | 26.10.2022 | CY | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | MK | 26.10.2022 | MT | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | TR | 26.10.2022 | IE | 27.10.2022 | LU | 27.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 27.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
BG | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
TR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
TR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 27.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
MK | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 27.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 27.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CY | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.10.2022 | ||
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010262272 (SHKOLNIK ALEXANDR [US], et al); | [XY]US2014252687 (EL-DASHER BASSEM S [US], et al); | [XY]US2015076732 (KEMMER AARON [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US5738088 (TOWNSEND PAUL [GB]); | [Y]US5837960 (LEWIS GARY K [US], et al); | [Y]US2005280185 (RUSSELL DAVID [US], et al); | [XY]US2007077323 (STONESMITH MATTHEW [US], et al); | [Y]US7777155 (TWELVES JR WENDELL V [US], et al); | [Y]US2013309121 (PREST CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al); | [Y]US2014140882 (SYASSEN FREERK [DE]); | [Y]US2015076732 (KEMMER AARON [US], et al); | [Y]US2015090074 (ETTER THOMAS [CH], et al); | Examination | US2006192322 | US2012113439 | by applicant | US2010262272 | US2012113439 | US2014252687 |