13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
18.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
19.02.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.02.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.02.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.11.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.10.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
04.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
13.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
11.01.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
10.08.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
10.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
16.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
10.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|