EP3373503 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Hiromasa c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 16861827.0 | 16.08.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016JP73902 | Priority number, date | JP20150218644 | 06.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015218644 | [2018/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017077758 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373503 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/00, H04W56/00 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,CN,US);
H04W56/0015 (CN,US);
H04L7/041 (US);
H04W4/40 (CN);
H04W4/70 (CN);
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04W56/0025 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2018/37] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2018/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2018 | Translation filed | 27.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 27.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2015116940 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0066] * * figure 6 *; | [X]US2015319723 (KORHONEN JUHA S [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *; | [XP]WO2015168931 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [XP] 1-15 * page 10, line 1 - page 13, line 24 ** figure 6 *; | [X] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on D2D Synchronization Procedure", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140330 SYNCHRONIZATION PROCEDURE_LG, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050735877 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]WO2015006082 (INTEL IP CORP [US], et al) [Y] 4, 7, 10 * , page 12, line 27 to page 14, line 8; fig. 5 & JP 2016-526822 A & US 2015/0009949 A1 & US 2015/0009875 A1 & US 2015/0009903 A1 & US 2015/0009948 A1 & US 2015/0009964 A1 & US 2015/0009975 A1 & US 2016/0226600 A1 & US 2016/0286508 A1 & WO 2015/006119 A1 & WO 2015/006218 A1 & WO 2015/006229 A1 & WO 2015/006256 A1 & WO 2015/006289 A1 & CN 105474716 A & CN 105264797 A & CN 105264842 A & CN 105284158 A & CN 105359438 A & CN 105409146 A & TW 201517583 A & KR 10-2016-0030884 A * [A] 1-3, 5, 6, 8, 9, 11-19; | [A]WO2015010542 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-19* , & WO 2015/010337 A1 & EP 3001631 A1 & CN 104813625 A & CN 103828398 A & KR 10-2016-0023857 A *; | [XY]WO2015046264 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3, 5, 6, 8, 9, 11-19 * , paragraphs [0133] to [0193]; fig. 15 to 18 & US 2016/0212594 A1 paragraphs [0170] to [0238]; fig. 15 to 18 * [Y] 4, 7, 10 | by applicant | WO2013080764 |