07.01.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
08.12.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.05.2020 |
First examination report |
|
12.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
31.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
11.01.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
27.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
10.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
16.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.04.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
20.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|