EP3371973 - EYE TRACKING USING A DIFFRACTION PATTERN OF COHERENT LIGHT ON THE SURFACE OF THE EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/37] | EYE TRACKING USING OPTICAL FLOW | ||
[2023/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/47] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Oculus VR, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREK, David R. OCULUS VR LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
HUNT, Warren Andrew OCULUS VR LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
DePUE, Marshall Thomas OCULUS VR LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
CAVIN, Robert Dale OCULUS VR LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/32] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2018/37] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16863124.0 | 04.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016US60718 | Priority number, date | US201562252057P | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252057 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017079689 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371973 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371973 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G06F3/03, G06F3/01, G02B27/01, G06T7/73 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
H04N13/366 (KR);
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (US);
G02F1/13 (US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06T7/74 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUGENVERFOLGUNG MIT HILFE EINES BEUGUNGSMUSTERS VON KOHÄRENTEM LICHT AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE DES AUGES | [2023/12] | English: | EYE TRACKING USING A DIFFRACTION PATTERN OF COHERENT LIGHT ON THE SURFACE OF THE EYE | [2023/12] | French: | SUIVI DE L'OEIL À L'AIDE D'UN MODÈLE DE DIFFRACTION DE LA LUMIÈRE COHÉRENTE SUR LA SURFACE DE L'OEIL | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/37] | AUGENVERFOLGUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VON OPTISCHEM FLUSS | ||
Former [2018/37] | EYE TRACKING USING OPTICAL FLOW | ||
Former [2018/37] | OCULOMÉTRIE UTILISANT UN FLUX OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 05.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | LU | 04.11.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 04.11.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004179716 (TAFUKU AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3* paragraphs [0105] - [0110]; figure 10 *; | [Y]WO2010011785 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] *; | [XAYI]US2015097772 (STARNER THAD EUGENE [US]) [X] 1,5-13 * paragraphs [0088] , [0095] , [0096] , [0101] * [A] 4 [Y] 2,3 [I] 14 | International search | [A]KR20110116580 (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0041]; claims 1-7; and figures 1-10. *; | [A]US2013077049 (BOHN DAVID D [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0041]; claims 1-9; and figures 1-9. *; | [XY]US2013128364 (WHEELER AARON JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1, 6-10, 15-20 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0059], [0064]; claims 1-15; and figures 1-8. * [Y] 2-5, 11-14; | [Y]US2015049013 (RAHMAN MD SAZZADUR [US], et al) [Y] 2-5, 11-14 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0048]; claims 1-6; and figures 1-9. *; | [A]US2015185475 (SAARIKKO PASI [FI], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0032]-[0045]; claims 1-8; and figures 1-6. * | by applicant | US2015097772 |