Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018321369 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IL51213 | 10.11.2016 | IL24258815 | 12.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3374789 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | A4 | EP3374789 | 19.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016IL51213 | 10.11.2016 | IL24258815 | 12.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201803688W | 30.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016IL51213 | 10.11.2016 | IL24258815 | 12.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017081685 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL24258815 | 12.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL242588 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2022 | B | Priority number | Date | IL24258815 | 12.11.2015 |