EP3381915 - LACTAM COMPOUND DERIVATIVE AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHWA Pharma Corporation No. 18 Yangshan Road Economic Development Zone Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221001 / CN | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yin No.18 Yangshan Road Economic Development Zone Xuzhou Jiangsu 221001 / CN | 02 /
DOU, Fei No.18 Yangshan Road Economic Development Zone Xuzhou Jiangsu 221001 / CN | 03 /
QIU, Yinli No.18 Yangshan Road Economic Development Zone Xuzhou Jiangsu 221001 / CN | 04 /
YU, Minquan No.18 Yangshan Road Economic Development Zone Xuzhou Jiangsu 221001 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Guisen No.18 Yangshan Road Economic Development Zone Xuzhou Jiangsu 221001 / CN | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 16865804.5 | 21.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016CN106591 | Priority number, date | CN201510811995 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: CN201510811995 | [2018/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017084627 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3381915 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3381915 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14, C07D217/24, C07D405/12, C07D417/12, C07D401/12, C07D239/88, C07D239/90, A61K31/517, A61K31/4725, A61K31/506, A61K31/496 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4725 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
C07D217/24 (EP,CN,US);
C07D221/04 (EP,US);
C07D239/88 (EP,CN,US);
C07D239/90 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACTAMVERBINDUNGSDERIVAT UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/40] | English: | LACTAM COMPOUND DERIVATIVE AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2018/40] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE COMPOSÉ LACTAME ET SON APPLICATION | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2018 | Translation filed | 18.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 18.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2023 | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | ES | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | IT | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
IT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CALDAS GIOVANA BAPTISTA ET AL, "Application of 4D-QSAR studies to a series of benzothiophene analogs", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MODELING, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, vol. 20, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00894-014-2420-4, ISSN 1610-2940, (20140916), pages 1 - 10, (20140916), XP035390888 [A] 1-11 * page 1; table 1; compounds 22-25,27-29,32,33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00894-014-2420-4 |