EP3379291 - IMAGING DEVICE AND SOLID-STATE IMAGING ELEMENT USED IN SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO, Haruka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-6, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KANEMITSU, Tomohiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-6, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HASUKA, Tsuyoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-6, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
OTANI, Mitsuhiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-6, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16865920.9 | 09.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016JP04837 | Priority number, date | US201562255645P | 16.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562255645 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017085916 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379291 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/10, G01S17/89, G01S7/486, G01S7/487 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
G01S7/4865 (EP,US);
G01C3/08 (US);
G01S17/10 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S7/4808 (US);
G01S7/4868 (US);
G01S7/487 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | G01S17/10, G01S7/487, G01S17/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSELEMENT DAFÜR | [2018/39] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE AND SOLID-STATE IMAGING ELEMENT USED IN SAME | [2018/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE ET ÉLÉMENT D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS UTILISÉ DANS CE DERNIER | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2018 | Translation filed | 30.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 30.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014207983 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0014] - [0026]; figures 1,5A,5B * [I] 13; | [P]US2016178734 (KAWAMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0002] , [0029] - [0039]; figures 1,5A,5B * | International search | [A]JP2001337166 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2001/0046317 A1 entire text; all drawings *; | [A]JP2007170856 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-12* , entire text; all drawings & US 2007/0146682 A1 entire text; all drawings *; | [A]WO2010013779 (UNIV SHIZUOKA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0157354 A1 entire text; all drawings & JP 2010-32425 A & EP 2322953 A1 & KR 10-2011-0044862 A *; | [XYA]JP2010256291 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-7, 11 * , paragraphs [0048] to [0126]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 8-10 [A] 12; | [A]JP2011215073 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013076645 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2014362364 (WALIGORSKI GREGORY M [US]) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [XY]WO2014207992 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0042]; fig. 2 to 4 & US 2016/0097841 A1 paragraphs [0054] to [0067]; fig. 2 to 4 * [Y] 8-10 | by applicant | JP2013538342 |